Mazurek v. Metalcraft of Mayville Inc
Plaintiff: |
Richard Mazurek |
Defendant: |
Metalcraft of Mayville Inc |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv01439 |
Filed: |
October 20, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin |
Office: |
Milwaukee Office |
County: |
Dodge |
Presiding Judge: |
William E Duffin |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 6, 2022 |
Filing
119
ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 4/6/22 that Defendant's motions for sanctions under Fed. R. Civ. 111 is DENIED. Plaintiffs' motions to dismiss the 12 related cases is GRANTED. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
|
December 16, 2021 |
Filing
109
ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 12/16/21 granting 90 Motion for Summary Judgment and DISMISSING case. (cc: all counsel)(MP)
|
April 23, 2021 |
Filing
79
ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING signed by Judge Brett Ludwig on 4/23/21. Plaintiff must submitted file list by 4/28/21. Defendant must respond by 4/29/21. Hearing on Expedited Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order will be held 4/30/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Judge Brett Ludwig. To appear by telephone, call the Courts conference line at 1-866-434-5269 and enter access code 1737450# before the scheduled hearing time. (cc: all counsel) (MP)
|
April 30, 2020 |
Filing
63
DECISION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 4/30/2020. Mazurek's "Motion to Decertify the Conditionally Certified Class and Send Notice Advising Putative Class Members That Their Statutes of Limitation Are No Longer Tolled" (ECF No. 55 ) is granted in part and denied in part. The motion to decertify is granted. The conditionally certified collective action is decertified, and the claims of the opt-in plaintiffs are dismissed without prejudice. This action will continue with Mazurek as the sole plaintiff. Mazurek's request to notify absent Rule 23 class members of the decertification is denied. The request for tolling of the statute of limitations is dismissed as moot. The "Stipulated Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint" (ECF No. 60 ) is granted. The amended complaint at ECF No. 60-1 is accepted as the operative complaint for Mazurek in his individual claims against Metalcraft. (cc: all counsel) (mlm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?