Smith v. Frame

Plaintiff: Virgil Smith
Defendant: B Frame
Case Number: 2:2017cv01745
Filed: December 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 10/9/2018: GRANTING 45 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING as moot 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and 60 Plaintiff's Motion to Review Certain Filed Documents; and DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Virgil M. Smith at Waupun Correctional Institution) (jm)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 6/27/2018: GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Depositions by Written Questions and DENYING 38 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. See Order. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Virgil M. Smith at Waupun Correctional Institution) (jm)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 4/26/2018 DENYING 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Virgil M. Smith at Waupun Correctional Institution) (jm)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 4/17/2018. 26 Plaintiff's Motion for Adequate Law Library Access DENIED. Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint ACCEPTED for filing; Plaintiff will continue to proceed on the single claim identified in 21 the Court's 3/5/2018 Screening Order. See Order. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Virgil M. Smith at Waupun Correctional Institution) (jm)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCREENING ORDER re 19 Second Amended Complaint signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 3/5/2018. Plaintiff PERMITTED to proceed on claim of violation of First Amendment right to freedom of association. Copies of Plaintiff's Second Amended Comp laint and this Order to be electronically SENT to Wisconsin DOJ for service on Defendant, who shall FILE a responsive pleading within 60 days. Agency having custody of Plaintiff to COLLECT balance of filing fee in accordance with this Order. See Order for further details. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Virgil M. Smith and Warden at Waupun Correctional Institution)(jm)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 1/8/2018 GRANTING 8 Plaintiff's Motion to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee with Release Account Funds and DIRECTING Wisconsin DOC to release $1.45 from Plaintiff's release account for such payment. IPFF to be paid by 1/16/2018 as previously ordered; failure to timely do so may result in dismissal of this action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Virgil Smith and Warden at Waupun Correctional Institution) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Frame
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Frame
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?