Wilson v. Milwaukee County
Plaintiff: Derrick Alan Wilson, Jr
Defendant: Milwaukee County
Case Number: 2:2018cv00241
Filed: February 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 5/29/2018 DISMISSING CASE without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Derrick Alan Wilson, Jr.)(jm)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 5/10/2018. By 5/21/2018, Plaintiff to FILE a Third Amended Complaint or this action will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. See Order. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Derrick Alan Wilson, Jr.)(jm)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 2/28/2018 GRANTING 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. By 3/30/2018, Plaintiff to file an amended complaint in accordance with this Order; failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action. See Order for further details. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Derrick Alan Wilson, Jr.) (jm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Milwaukee County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Alan Wilson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?