Howard et al v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Howard, UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc and US Department of Health & Human Services
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Blume SPE Saukville, Benenson Capital Company, ABC Corporation, John Doe, DEF Insurance Company, GHI Insurance Company, JKL Insurance Company and MNO Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00431
Filed: March 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 10/11/2018: REMANDING CASE to state court for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to take all appropriate steps to effectuate the remand of this case back to the Milwaukee County Circuit Court. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 9/18/2018. Within 14 days, Defendants to FILE a joint brief on the propriety of the Court's subject-matter jurisdiction in this action; Plaintiff to RESPOND within 7 days of the filing of Defendants' brief. No further briefs will be permitted; briefs must not exceed 15 pages. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 6/19/2018. Within 14 days, Plaintiff to provide evidence of timely service or otherwise explain why good cause exists to extend the Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) service deadline as to Defendant Benenson Capital Company. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard et al v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Howard
Represented By: Patrick D Bomhack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc
Represented By: Matthew S Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Department of Health & Human Services
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Carlos R Pastrana
Represented By: Nelson W Phillips, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blume SPE Saukville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benenson Capital Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHI Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JKL Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MNO Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?