Bogan v. Mason et al
Plaintiff: Antwan Bogan
Defendant: Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco and Firearms and Matthew Mason
Case Number: 2:2018cv01108
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2018 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $6.68, receipt number MK4689-073525. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)
August 3, 2018 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Antwan Bogan. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lz)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that on or before 8/24/2018 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 6.68 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 8/3/2018. (cc: all counsel- via US Mail to Plaintiff and Milwaukee County Sheriff for Milw County Jail)(lz)
August 1, 2018 Docket Annotation - Plaintiff is now at the Milwaukee County Jail pursuant to his filing in case no 18-cv-1091 ECF No 10. (lz)
August 1, 2018 Filing 6 Additional Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Antwan Bogan. (lz)
July 27, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER from Antwan Bogan to the Clerk's office re: difficulty in getting trust account statements from other facilities. (mlm)
July 27, 2018 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Antwan Bogan. (mlm)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting he submit a certified copy of his trust account for the preceding six months. (blr)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Antwan Bogan. (blr)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Antwan Bogan. (blr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bogan v. Mason et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco and Firearms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwan Bogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?