Harris v. Betthauser et al
Plaintiff: Sammie Jerwan Harris
Defendant: Charles D Betthauser and Judge Anna Becker
Case Number: 2:2018cv01110
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Brown
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2018 Docket Annotation - Case opened in the Western District of Wisconsin as 3:18-CV-655 (vkb)
August 7, 2018 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Sammie Jerwan Harris. (lh)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 LETTER from Sammie Harris. (lh)
August 7, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Sammie Jerwan Harris. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lh)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/7/2018 Transferring Venue to the United States District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin. (cc: all counsel and copy sent to the plaintiff by US Mail on 8/7/2018)(kgw)
July 26, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER from the Clerk to Sammie Jerwan Harris regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)
July 19, 2018 NOTICE from the clerk mailed to plaintiff requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Duffin be filed within 21 days; also requesting a copy of his six-month certified trust account statement (vkb)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee filed by plaintiff Sammie Jerwan Harris (vkb)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Sammie Jerwan Harris(vkb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Betthauser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D Betthauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Anna Becker
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammie Jerwan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?