Haslinger v. Old Fashioned Foods
Plaintiff: Kenneth Haslinger
Defendant: Old Fashioned Foods
Case Number: 2:2018cv01118
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kenneth Haslinger. (Mailed NEF and docket to plaintiff via USPS) (asc)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph that on or before September 4, 2018 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $52.20 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Plaintiff & Sheriff at Westchester County Jail)(blr)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 PARTIAL Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (3 months) by Kenneth Haslinger. (blr)
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Kenneth Haslinger. (blr)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kenneth Haslinger. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (blr)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting payment of the filing fee or that an IFP and certified trust account statement for the past six months be filed within 21 days. (blr)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against Old Fashioned Foods by Kenneth Haslinger. (blr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haslinger v. Old Fashioned Foods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Fashioned Foods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Haslinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?