Sign Effectz Inc v. Kowalski et al
Plaintiff: Sign Effectz Inc
Defendant: DL Sign Systems Inc and John Kowalski
Case Number: 2:2018cv01125
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Michael J. Gentry ISO 7(h) Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gentry, Michael)
August 21, 2018 Filing 11 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Expedite Motion to Compel Defendants' Production of Documents by Sign Effectz Inc. (Gentry, Michael)
August 17, 2018 Filing 10 LETTER from Michael J. Gentry to Judge Pepper removing Attorney O'Malley. (Gentry, Michael)
August 16, 2018 Filing 9 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Plaintiffs. (Gentry, Michael)
August 2, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2018 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Judge Pamela Pepper. Parties wishing to appear by phone may do so by calling the court's conference line at 888-557-8511 and using access code 4893665#. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 10/30/2018. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
August 1, 2018 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Gentry, Michael)
July 31, 2018 Due to non-consent, case reassigned to Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (mlm)
July 31, 2018 NOTICE To PLAINTIFF - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days. (mlm)
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Sign Effectz Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Gentry, Michael)
July 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Gentry on behalf of Sign Effectz Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: michael j gentry (Gentry, Michael)
July 26, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Huitink, Michael)
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Huitink, Michael)
July 23, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Huitink, Michael)
July 20, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (bx)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John Kowalski, DL Sign Systems, Inc. from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 18CV2606 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2880772)(Huitink, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet #2 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Original Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Pleadings, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (bx). Modified on 7/20/2018 (bx).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sign Effectz Inc v. Kowalski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DL Sign Systems Inc
Represented By: Michael D Huitink
Represented By: Stephanie H Anacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kowalski
Represented By: Michael D Huitink
Represented By: Stephanie H Anacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sign Effectz Inc
Represented By: Christopher P Banaszak
Represented By: Robert K Sholl
Represented By: Michael J Gentry
Represented By: Katherine M O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?