Rice v. IVOTE Inc et al

Plaintiff: Mark Rice
Defendant: IVOTE Inc, IVOTE Civic Education Fund Inc and Ellen Kurtz
Case Number: 2:2018cv01183
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Kenosha
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2018 12 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/24/2018. The court APPROVES #11 the parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and GRANTS #10 the Unopposed Motion to Enter Order Granting Stipulated Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendants to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on October 15, 2018. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Mark Rice)(cb)
September 21, 2018 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by IVOTE Civic Education Fund Inc, IVOTE Inc, Ellen Kurtz. (Anstaett, David)
September 21, 2018 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by IVOTE Civic Education Fund Inc, IVOTE Inc, Ellen Kurtz. (Anstaett, David)
September 13, 2018 Copy of 9 Text Only Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer sent via mail to Mark Rice. (cb)
September 13, 2018 9 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/13/2018. The court APPROVES #7 the parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and GRANTS #8 the Unopposed Motion to Enter Order Granting Stipulated Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendants to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on September 24, 2018. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
September 13, 2018 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by IVOTE Civic Education Fund Inc, IVOTE Inc, Ellen Kurtz. (Anstaett, David) Modified on 9/13/2018 (amb).
September 13, 2018 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by IVOTE Civic Education Fund Inc, IVOTE Inc, Ellen Kurtz. (Anstaett, David)
August 28, 2018 6 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/28/2018 re #4 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and #5 Unopposed Motion to Enter Order Granting Stipulated Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation for an extension of time and GRANTS the motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendants to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on September 14, 2018. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
August 24, 2018 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Enter Order Granting Stipulation by IVOTE Civic Education Fund Inc, IVOTE Inc, Ellen Kurtz. (Anstaett, David)
August 24, 2018 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by IVOTE Civic Education Fund Inc, IVOTE Inc, Ellen Kurtz. (Anstaett, David)
August 3, 2018 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (amb)
August 2, 2018 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Mark Rice. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (amb)
August 2, 2018 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Mark Rice. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. Jury Demand (Filing Fee PAID ; MK4689-073140) (Service Packet Issued) (Attachments: #1 Bookmarked Exhibits)(amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. IVOTE Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVOTE Inc
Represented By: David L Anstaett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVOTE Civic Education Fund Inc
Represented By: David L Anstaett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Kurtz
Represented By: David L Anstaett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?