Bogan et al v. Schimel et al
Plaintiff: Kameron Walker, Bryson McKinney, Terrance Holland, Maurice Craine, John Miller, Antwan Bogan, Rodney Bowman, Patrick T Evans, Donvonta Pearson, Everett E Devore and Paul J Brown
Defendant: Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Division of Community Corrections, John Chisholm, Brad Schimel, Milwaukee County Public Defenders Office, Milwaukee Police Department and Milwaukee County District Attorney's Office
Case Number: 2:2018cv01204
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change of Address as to Rodney Bowman to DCI. (address updated) (mlm)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/19/2018. Antwan Bogan's motion to dismiss (ECF No. #20 ) is GRANTED. This case is dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1). (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to Antwan Bogan, Rodney Bowman, Bryson McKinney, Maurice Craine, Terrance Holland) (mlm)
September 13, 2018 Copies of complaint forms sent via U.S. Mail to Antwan Bogan as requested in Motion to Dismiss #20 . (lz)
September 13, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Antwan Bogan. (lz)
August 29, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rodney Bowman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope with new address at Milwaukee County Jail)(lz)
August 27, 2018 Filing 18 PROPOSED Joint Amended Complaint filed by Rodney Bowman, Maurice Craine, Terrance Holland, Bryson McKinney, John Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mlm)
August 24, 2018 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $6.68, receipt number MK4689-073525. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)
August 22, 2018 Filing 17 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Antwan Bogan. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lz)
August 22, 2018 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Attorney General Brad Schimel, Milwaukee County Circuit Courts, Milwaukee County District Attorney's Office, Milwaukee County Public Defender's Office, Milwaukee Police Department, and Division of Community Corrections filed by Antwan Bogan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lz)
August 20, 2018 Filing 15 Mail Sent to Kameron Walker Returned as Undeliverable re #13 Order Directing Prisoner Payment. Walker is not at the Milwaukee County House of Correction. (lz)
August 9, 2018 Filing 14 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff Antwan Bogan re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (lz)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 8/8/2018 that on or before 8/29/2018 plaintiff Antwan Bogan shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 6.68 as an initial partial filing fee. Upon payment the court will determine whether the action can continue to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If Bogan does not wish to pay the filing fee or if he wishes to dismiss this action to avoid incurring a "strike" under 28 USC 1915(g), he must notify the court by filing a letter with the Clerk of Court on or before 8/29/2018. In the complaint caption Bogan names ten other plaintiffs and describes it as a "class action complaint." Bogan, who is confined at the Milwaukee County Jail, is the only plaintiff who signed the complaint. Because Bogan is the only plaintiff who signed the complaint, the court considers it to have been filed only by Bogan and not by the other ten individuals named as plaintiffs. Because he does not have an attorney, Bogan probably would not be allowed to bring a class action. If Bogan and the other individuals named as plaintiffs decide to file a joint amended complaint, the court will, (1) assess each plaintiff an initial partial filing fee, (2) wait for each plaintiff to submit his initial partial filing fee to the court, and (3) upon receipt of all of the filing fees, screen the amended complaint. If a joint amended complaint is not filed by 8/29/2018 the court will screen the current complaint once Bogan pays the initial partial filing fee. (cc: all counsel- via US Mail to Antwan Bogan with Complaint form, Guide to Filing Prisoner Complaints, and Answers to Prisoner Litigants' Common Questions; Dennis Brand-Milw County Sheriff's Office; Rodney Bowman; Bryson McKinney; Kameron Walker; Maurice Craine; Terrance Holland)(lz)
August 6, 2018 Filing 12 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Maurice Craine. (lz)
August 3, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Kameron Walker. (lz)
August 3, 2018 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Terrance Holland. (lz)
August 3, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Terrance Holland. (lz)
August 3, 2018 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Bryson McKinney. (lz)
August 3, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Bryson McKinney. (lz)
August 3, 2018 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Rodney Bowman. (lz)
August 3, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Rodney Bowman. (lz)
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 Additional Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Antwan Bogan from case no 18-cv-1091. (lz)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Antwan Bogan from case no 18-cv-1091. (lz)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Antwan Bogan. (lz)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Antwan Bogan, Rodney Bowman, Bryson McKinney, Terrance Holland, John Miller, Kameron Walker, Maurice Craine, Everett E Devore, Patrick T Evans, Paul J Brown, Donvonta Pearson. **Complaint is signed only by Plaintiff Antwan Bogan as movant.** (Filing Fee NOT PAID $400) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(lz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2018: #2 Legible Page 3) (lz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2018: #3 Legible Page 7) (lz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2018: #4 Legible Page 8) (lz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2018: #5 Legible Page 9) (lz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bogan et al v. Schimel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kameron Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryson McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Craine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwan Bogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick T Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donvonta Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everett E Devore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul J Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County Circuit Court
Represented By: Milwaukee County - 550, 555
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division of Community Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Chisholm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Schimel
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County Public Defenders Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County District Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?