McDougal v. Montoya et al
Plaintiff: Freddie James McDougal and Freddie James McDougal, Jr
Defendant: CO D Berry, Nurse Samantha, CO Chamblise, Doctor Brandon and CO Montoya
Case Number: 2:2018cv01218
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Brown
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS ORDERED: McDouglal has until October 10, 2018 to pay his initial partial filing fee. If he fails to do so, or explain why he cannot pay it, I will dismiss his case for failure to prosecute. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Plaintiff)(blr)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before September 7, 2018, McDougal shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $1.40 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, Warden)(asc)
August 16, 2018 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Freddie James McDougal, Jr. (mac)
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 LETTER from Freddie McDougal regarding trust account statement. (mac)
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Freddie James McDougal, Jr. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mac)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER from the Clerk to Freddie James McDougal, Jr regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Freddie McDougal re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form and a six month certified trust account statement be filed within 21 days (lh)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Freddie James McDougal. (lh)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Freddie James McDougal. (lh)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Freddie James McDougal. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDougal v. Montoya et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie James McDougal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie James McDougal, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO D Berry
Represented By: Milwaukee County - 550, 555
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Samantha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Chamblise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?