Solache Morales v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, L Francis Cissna, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kirjsten Nielsen, Donald Neufeld and Department of Homeland Security
Petitioner: Cesar Solache Morales
Respondent: Dale Schmidt and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 2:2018cv01233
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 8:1105(a) Aliens: Habeas Corpus to Release INS Det
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Case Terminated pursuant to #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (amb)
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cesar Solache Morales. (Goettel, Katherine)
August 28, 2018 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Goettel, Katherine)
August 20, 2018 Summons Issued as to all respondents.(amb)
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Goettel, Katherine)
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Goettel, Katherine)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Dale Schmidt (Goettel, Katherine)
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Kirjsten Nielsen (Goettel, Katherine)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Donald Neufeld (Goettel, Katherine)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Department of Homeland Security (Goettel, Katherine)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by L Francis Cissna (Goettel, Katherine)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine E Goettel on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Katherine Melloy Goettel (Goettel, Katherine)
August 10, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Complaint Under the Administrative Procedure Act filed by Cesar Solache Morales. ( Filing Fee PAID $5 receipt number 0757-2895482) (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - USCIS Receipt Notice, #2 Ex. B - April 2018 Email from Counsel, #3 Ex. C - Aug. 2018 Email from Counsel, #4 Ex. D - USCIS U Visa Processing Times, #5 Ex. E - Maniar v. Warden of Pine Prairie)(Goettel, Katherine) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2018: #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (lz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solache Morales v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirjsten Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Neufeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dale Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cesar Solache Morales
Represented By: Katherine E Goettel
Represented By: Claudia B Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?