US Bank NA et al v. Aurora Health Care Southern Lakes Inc et al
Plaintiff: Shane Murphy, Kathleen Murphy, Parker Alan Murphy and US Bank NA
Defendant: Aurora Medical Group, Inc., Anthony Park, M.D., Injured Patients and Families Compensation Fund, Aurora Health Care Southern Lakes Inc, Aurora Medical Center Kenosha, Kenneth Raskin, M.D., Anthony Park, MD, Aurora Medical Group Inc and Kenneth Raskin, MD
Case Number: 2:2018cv01293
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Injured Patients and Families Compensation Fund.(McFarlane, David)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/9/18. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on November 16, 2018 at 1:15 p.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
October 4, 2018 Filing 17 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Injured Patients and Families Compensation Fund. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(McFarlane, David)
October 4, 2018 Due to non-consent, case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (mlm)
October 3, 2018 Filing 16 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Aurora Medical Group Inc, Anthony Park, MD. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Gutglass, James)
October 3, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by James R Gutglass on behalf of Aurora Medical Group Inc, Anthony Park, MD. Attorney(s) appearing: James R. Gutglass (Gutglass, James)
October 3, 2018 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Aurora Health Care Southern Lakes Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Brewer, Cory)
October 3, 2018 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Aurora Medical Group Inc, Kenneth Raskin, MD. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Weir, Todd)
September 26, 2018 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendants, Aurora Medical Group and Kenneth Raskin requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (mlm)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Aurora Medical Group Inc, Kenneth Raskin, MD.(Weir, Todd)
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd M Weir on behalf of Aurora Medical Group Inc, Kenneth Raskin, MD. Attorney(s) appearing: Todd M. Weir (Weir, Todd)
September 13, 2018 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendants requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (mlm)
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory J Brewer on behalf of Aurora Health Care Southern Lakes Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Cory J. Brewer (Brewer, Cory)
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean M Gaynor on behalf of Aurora Health Care Southern Lakes Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Sean M. Gaynor (Gaynor, Sean)
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kathleen Murphy, Shane Murphy, US Bank NA. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Goldberg, Jeffrey)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aurora Health Care Southern Lakes Inc - Waiver sent on 8/24/2018; Aurora Medical Group Inc - Waiver sent on 8/24/2018. (Goldberg, Jeffrey)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kenneth Raskin, MD - Waiver sent on 8/23/2018. (Goldberg, Jeffrey)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Injured Patients and Families Compensation Fund. (McFarlane, David)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David E McFarlane on behalf of Injured Patients and Families Compensation Fund. Attorney(s) appearing: David E. McFarlane (McFarlane, David)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anthony Park, MD - Waiver sent on 9/4/2018. (Gutglass, James)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Goldberg, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2018 Case Opening Modification(s): The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (mlm)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Aurora Health Care Southern Lakes Inc, Aurora Medical Center Kenosha, Aurora Medical Group, Inc., Injured Patients and Families Compensation Fund, Anthony Park, M.D., Kenneth Raskin, M.D. by Shane Murphy, Kathleen Murphy, Parker Alan Murphy. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2903664)(Goldberg, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).
August 22, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Bank NA et al v. Aurora Health Care Southern Lakes Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Murphy
Represented By: Jeffrey M Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Murphy
Represented By: Jeffrey M Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parker Alan Murphy
Represented By: Jeffrey M Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Bank NA
Represented By: Jeffrey M Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Park, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Injured Patients and Families Compensation Fund
Represented By: David E McFarlane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Health Care Southern Lakes Inc
Represented By: Sean M Gaynor
Represented By: Cory J Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Medical Center Kenosha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Raskin, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Park, MD
Represented By: James R Gutglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Medical Group Inc
Represented By: Todd M Weir
Represented By: James R Gutglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Raskin, MD
Represented By: Todd M Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?