Dominguez-Torres v. Dittmann et al
Plaintiff: Jorge Dominguez-Torres
Defendant: Beth Dittmann, RN Joni, Jane and John Does and RN Kashia
Case Number: 2:2018cv01322
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: David E Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER AND REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David Jones William E Duffin for Pretrial Case Management signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/24/18. IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee #2 is GRANTED. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel #13 is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that, pursuant to an informal service agreement between the Wisconsin Department of Justice and this court, copies of plaintiffs complaint and this order are being electronically sent today to the Wisconsin Department of Justice for service on the state defendants Nurse Kashia, RN Joni, and Beth Dittmann. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that, pursuant to the informal service agreement between the Wisconsin Department of Justice and this court, the defendants Nurse Kashia, RN Joni, and Beth Dittmann shall file a responsive pleading to the complaint within sixty days of receiving electronic notice of this order. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that within thirty days from the date of this order defendants Nurse Kashia, RN Joni, and Beth Dittmann shall provide the plaintiff with the names and job titles of the officials and employees who received the plaintiffs requests for treatment and who treated him from June 28, 2013 to July 3, 2013; and any documentation related to such requests for medical care and treatment, responses thereto, and any inmate complaints the plaintiff filed at or around that time. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the defendants Nurse Kashia, RN Joni, and Beth Dittmann shall file a certificate of service of this information on the plaintiff at the time of service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within thirty days of the defendants Nurse Kashia, RN Joni, and Beth Dittmanns filing of the certificate of service regarding the documents ordered to be provided to the plaintiff, the plaintiff must file a motion to substitute the real name for the Jane and John Doe placeholders, or a letter explaining why he is unable to do so. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the agency having custody of the plaintiff shall collect from his institution trust account the $340.71 balance of the filing fee by collecting monthly payments from the plaintiff's prison trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month's income credited to the plaintiffs trust account and forwarding payments to the Clerk of Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that a copy of this order be sent to the officer in charge of the agency where the plaintiff is confined. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case shall be referred to a magistrate judge for pretrial processing. The magistrate judge will enter any orders that he or she has authority to enter. For dispositive motions, the magistrate will issue a report and recommendation. (cc: all counsel, financial, plaintiff, warden)(jad) Modified on 10/25/2018 (jcl).
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REQUEST to resubmit the consent to proceed form by Jorge Dominguez-Torres. (cms)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge David E Jones no longer assigned to the case. (amb)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jorge Dominguez-Torres. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (cms)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $9.29, receipt number MK4689-074123. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jorge Dominguez-Torres. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (cms)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 9/18/18 GRANTING #10 Motion for Order to Use Release Account. The agency having custody of Mr. Dominguez-Torres shall collect from his institution trust account $9.29 as payment for the initial partial filing fee in this action and shall forward that sum to the Clerk of Court. The agency shall first draw funds from Mr. Dominguez-Torres's regular account, and when no other funds are available in the regular account, shall draw the remaining balance of the initial partial payment from plaintiffs release account. Payment shall be sent by October 16, 2018. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff and Warden, WCI) (kah)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jorge Dominguez-Torres. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (cms)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Order REQUEST for the court to do an order allowing him to use his release account funds and/or MOTION for Extension of Time by Jorge Dominguez-Torres . (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(cms) Modified event on 9/17/2018 (kah). Added MOTION for Extension of Time on 9/17/2018 (kah).
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER from the plaintiff regarding defendant names. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(cms)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jorge Dominguez-Torres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(cms). Added MOTION to Appoint Spanish Interpreter on 9/6/2018 (kah).
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER from the Clerk to Jorge Dominguez-Torres regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER that on or before 9/20/18 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 9.29 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 9/5/18. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff and Warden, WCI)(kah)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before September 20, 2018 the plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $9.29 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, Warden)(asc)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Jones and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Mailed to plaintiff. (cms) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/28/2018 with correct letter) (cms). Modified on 8/28/2018 (cms).
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jorge Dominguez-Torres. (cms)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Jorge Dominguez-Torres. (cms)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with jury demand filed against All Defendants by Jorge Dominguez-Torres. (cms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominguez-Torres v. Dittmann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Dominguez-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Dittmann
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Joni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Kashia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?