Kenall Manufacturing Co et al v. Oldenburg Group Incorporated

Plaintiff: University of Strathclyde and Kenall Manufacturing Co
Defendant: Oldenburg Group Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2018cv01352
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2018 24 DECLARATION of Matthew P. Becker in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in support of motion to dismiss, #2 Exhibit Opposition to motion to dismiss, #3 Exhibit Reply in support of motion to dismiss)(Becker, Matthew)
October 26, 2018 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Oldenburg Group Incorporated. (Becker, Matthew)
October 26, 2018 22 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Plaintiffs. (Miotke, Joseph)
October 25, 2018 21 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 10/25/18 GRANTING #20 Rule 7(H) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Reports. The parties Rule 26(f) Report is now due by 10/26/2018. Please note that there is no document attached to this order. (cc: all counsel) (kah)
October 25, 2018 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jonathan H. Margolies filed by Oldenburg Group Incorporated, #19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Katherine W. Schill filed by Oldenburg Group Incorporated ; The incorrect event was chosen. The documents were not captioned as motions so Notice would be the proper event. These docket entries have been corrected and nothing needs to be refiled.; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (kah)
October 24, 2018 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Reports - Civ. L. R, 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion by All Plaintiffs. (Miotke, Joseph)
October 24, 2018 19 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Katherine W. Schill MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Oldenburg Group Incorporated. (Schill, Katherine) Modified event on 10/25/2018 (kah).
October 24, 2018 18 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Jonathan H. Margolies MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Oldenburg Group Incorporated. (Margolies, Jonathan) Modified event on 10/25/2018 (kah).
October 24, 2018 17 NOTICE of Appearance by James F Boyle on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: James F. Boyle (Boyle, James)
October 15, 2018 16 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 10/15/18. The parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time, ECF No. #15 , is APPROVED. Defendant shall have until 10/26/18 to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs' Complaint. NOTE: There is no document attached to this text-only order. (cc: all counsel)(jh)
October 12, 2018 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Oldenburg Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Becker, Matthew)
October 12, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P Becker on behalf of Oldenburg Group Incorporated. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew P. Becker (Becker, Matthew)
October 9, 2018 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2018 11:00 AM By Telephone before Magistrate Judge David E Jones. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at 877-848-7030 and use access code 3866147# to join the call. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 10/24/2018. (cc: all counsel) (Attachments: #1 Judges Procedures and Case Management Guidance)(kah)
October 9, 2018 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (kah)
October 8, 2018 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Oldenburg Group Incorporated. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Margolies, Jonathan)
September 26, 2018 11 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 9/26/18. The parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time, ECF No. #9 , is APPROVED. Defendant's answer is now due by 10/12/2018. NOTE: There is no document attached to this text-only order. (cc: all counsel)(jh)
September 26, 2018 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge David E Jones be filed within 14 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (kah)
September 25, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine W Schill on behalf of Oldenburg Group Incorporated. Attorney(s) appearing: Katherine W. Schill (Schill, Katherine)
September 25, 2018 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Oldenburg Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Extension of Time)(Margolies, Jonathan)
September 25, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan H Margolies on behalf of Oldenburg Group Incorporated. Attorney(s) appearing: Jonathan H. Margolies (Margolies, Jonathan)
September 20, 2018 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Miotke, Joseph)
September 7, 2018 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #6 Certificate of Service filed by Kenall Manufacturing Co, University of Strathclyde ; The incorrect event was chosen; Summons Returned Executed is the proper event. This document does not need to be refiled. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (kah)
September 6, 2018 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Oldenburg Group Inc served on 9/5/2018 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Hills, Matthew) Modified event on 9/7/2018 (kah).
September 6, 2018 5 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (kah)
September 4, 2018 4 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 9/4/18. Plaintiff must file proof of service of the complaint or a report on the status of service for each defendant within 45 days of the date of this order. Please note that there is no document attached to this order. (cc: all counsel)(kah)
September 4, 2018 Summons Issued as to Oldenburg Group Incorporated. (kah)
August 31, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Hills on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew J. Hills (Hills, Matthew)
August 31, 2018 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Miotke, Joseph)
August 31, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (cms)
August 31, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Oldenburg Group Incorporated by Kenall Manufacturing Co, University of Strathclyde. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2910803) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Miotke, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenall Manufacturing Co et al v. Oldenburg Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Strathclyde
Represented By: Matthew J Hills
Represented By: Joseph T Miotke
Represented By: Tiffany D Gehrke
Represented By: Benjamin T Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenall Manufacturing Co
Represented By: Matthew J Hills
Represented By: Joseph T Miotke
Represented By: Tiffany D Gehrke
Represented By: Benjamin T Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oldenburg Group Incorporated
Represented By: Katherine W Schill
Represented By: James F Boyle
Represented By: Jonathan H Margolies
Represented By: Matthew P Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?