Tsonis et al v. Forest County Potawatomi Community et al
Plaintiff: Dimitrios Tsonis and Eugenia Tsonis
Defendant: Forest County Potawatomi Community and St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company/The Travelers Indemnity Company
Undetermined: US Department of Health and Human Services Medicare Parts A&B and Illinois Department of Healthcare and Family Services
Case Number: 2:2018cv01376
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by US Department of Health and Human Services Medicare Parts A&B. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Flaherty, Maura)
October 31, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Maura S Flaherty on behalf of US Department of Health and Human Services Medicare Parts A&B. Attorney(s) appearing: Assistant United States Attorney Maura S. Flaherty (Flaherty, Maura)
October 30, 2018 Filing 11 LETTER from the Court Plaintiffs Counsel requesting a status report by 11/21/2018 regarding service of the summons and complaint upon Involuntary Plaintiffs Illinois Department of Health and Family Services and US Department of Health and Human Services Medicare Parts A&B. (cc: All Counsel) (lz)
October 30, 2018 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company/The Travelers Indemnity Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pasholk, Stephen)
October 23, 2018 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #9 Rule 26(a) Disclosure Statement filed by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company/The Travelers Indemnity Company, Forest County Potawatomi Community; Certain discovery documents should not be filed. Please see Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d) for further information. The document has been replaced with a copy of Rule 5. Discovery documents should be served on opposing counsel in paper format; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lz)
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE Statement by Forest County Potawatomi Community and St Paul Mercury Insurance/The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Pasholk, Stephen) Modified on 10/23/2018 (lz). (Main Document 9 replaced on 10/23/2018) (lz).
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James H Podolny on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: James H. Podolny (Attachments: #1 L.R. 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(Podolny, James)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Forest County Potawatomi Community. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pasholk, Stephen)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Forest County Potawatomi Community and St Paul Mercury Insurance Company/The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Pasholk, Stephen) Modified on 10/23/2018 (lz).
October 3, 2018 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendant Forest County Potawatomi Community requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (lz)
October 3, 2018 NOTICE - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days. (lz)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Forest County Potawatomi Community and St Paul Mercury Insurance Company/The Travelers Indemnity Company.(Pasholk, Stephen) Modified on 10/23/2018 (lz).
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W Pasholk on behalf of Forest County Potawatomi Community and St Paul Mercury Insurance Company . Attorney(s) appearing: Stephen W. Pasholk (Pasholk, Stephen) Modified on 10/23/2018 (lz).
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Duncan, Robert)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Duncan, Robert)
September 6, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Dimitrios Tsonis, Eugenia Tsonis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duncan, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tsonis et al v. Forest County Potawatomi Community et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dimitrios Tsonis
Represented By: Robert R Duncan
Represented By: James H Podolny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenia Tsonis
Represented By: Robert R Duncan
Represented By: James H Podolny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Department of Health and Human Services Medicare Parts A&B
Represented By: Maura S Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Illinois Department of Healthcare and Family Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest County Potawatomi Community
Represented By: Stephen W Pasholk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company/The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Stephen W Pasholk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?