Roth v. The Walsh Co Inc et al

Plaintiff: Ian Roth
Defendant: Walsh Products, Inc., The Walsh Co. Inc., Walsh Products Inc and The Walsh Co Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01431
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2018 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)
November 7, 2018 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Ian Roth (Andersen, Evan)
October 25, 2018 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Ian Roth. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Andersen, Evan)
October 25, 2018 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed no later than November 8, 2018; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc) Modified on 10/25/2018 (asc).
September 13, 2018 3 REPORT on the Filing of an Action Regarding Copyright. (Mailed to U.S. Copyright Office via USPS)(asc)
September 12, 2018 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Ian Roth. (Andersen, Evan)
September 12, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
September 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against all Defendants Ian Roth by Ian Roth. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2919652) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andersen, Evan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2018: #4 Signed Civil Cover Sheet) (mlm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roth v. The Walsh Co Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walsh Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Walsh Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walsh Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Walsh Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Roth
Represented By: Evan A Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?