Paredes et al v. Kenosha Unified School District No 1 et al
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Paredes
Defendant: William Haithcock, Karen Wambold, Scott Kennow, Kenosha Unified School District No. 1, Ron Sandoval, David Naylor and Kenosha Unified School District No 1
Undetermined: State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services
Case Number: 2:2018cv01440
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2018 Filing 25 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint by All Defendants.(Stadler, Ronald)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 11/8/2018: Interim Settlement Report due by 4/8/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 4/12/2019; Final Settlement Report due by 8/12/2019; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 8/16/2019; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 8/21/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2019 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 9/3/2019 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
October 30, 2018 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 10/30/2018. (Court Reporter John Schindhelm) (nb)
October 25, 2018 Filing 22 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Defendants. (Stadler, Ronald)
October 24, 2018 Filing 20 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Stadler, Ronald)
October 24, 2018 Filing 19 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pledl, Robert)
October 23, 2018 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Guadalupe Paredes.(asc)
October 23, 2018 Filing 18 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Guadalupe Paredes. Amended Complaint (Pledl, Robert)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 10/12/2018 GRANTING #16 Joint Motion to Modify Filing of Amended Complaint and Responsive Pleading. Defendants are relieved from filing an answer to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint; Plaintiff is to file an Amended Complaint by 10/23/2018; Defendants are to file a responsive pleading within 21 days of the filing of the Amended Complaint. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
October 12, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 10/25/2018. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
October 10, 2018 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Modify Filing of Amended Complaint and Responsive Pleading by All Defendants. (Stadler, Ronald)
October 10, 2018 NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFFS requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed no later than October 24, 2018; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
October 10, 2018 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANTS requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald S Stadler on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Jonathan Sacks (Stadler, Ronald)
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald S Stadler on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Ronald S. Stadler, Jonathan Sacks (Stadler, Ronald)
October 5, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Guadalupe Paredes. William Haithcock served on 9/20/2018. (Pledl, Robert)
October 5, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Guadalupe Paredes. Scott Kennow served on 9/20/2018. (Pledl, Robert)
October 5, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Kenosha Unified School District No 1 served on 9/20/2018. (Pledl, Robert)
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Guadalupe Paredes. Ron Sandoval served on 10/2/2018. (Pledl, Robert)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Karen Wambold served on 9/20/2018. (Pledl, Robert)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. David Naylor served on 9/20/2018. (Pledl, Robert)
October 5, 2018 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #3 - #7 Affidavit of Service. The incorrect event was chosen. The correct event to use is Summons Returned Executed. These documents do not need to be re-filed. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (blr)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Ron Sandoval served 10/2/2018. (Pledl, Robert) Modified on 10/5/2018 (blr).
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Karen Wambold served 9/20/2018. (Pledl, Robert) Modified on 10/5/2018 (blr).
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of David Naylor served 9/20/2018. (Pledl, Robert) Modified on 10/5/2018 (blr).
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of William Haithcock served 9/20/2018. (Pledl, Robert) Modified on 10/5/2018 (blr).
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Scott Kennow served 9/20/2018. (Pledl, Robert) Modified on 10/5/2018 (blr).
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed AFFIDAVIT of Affidavit of Service-Kenosha. Unified School District No. 1 served 9/20/2018. (Pledl, Robert) Modified on 10/5/2018 (blr).
September 17, 2018 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (blr)
September 14, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Guadalupe Paredes. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2921285) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons David Naylor Summons, #3 Summons Karen Wambold Summons, #4 Summons Scott Kennow Summons, #5 Summons Kenosha Unified School District Summons, #6 Summons Ron Sandoval Summons, #7 Summons Karen Wambold)(Pledl, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paredes et al v. Kenosha Unified School District No 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Haithcock
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Wambold
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kennow
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenosha Unified School District No. 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Sandoval
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Naylor
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenosha Unified School District No 1
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Paredes
Represented By: Robert Theine Pledl
Represented By: Mark A Peterson
Represented By: Daniel A Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?