Condon v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Tammy Condon
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv01458
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/1/2018. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David E. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Tammy Condon. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Schuessler, Thomas)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Nancy A Berryhill. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Tammy Condon. (Schuessler, Thomas)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties. By 11/19/2018 defendant to file and serve certified administrative record. Plaintiff's brief due 12/31/2018; defendant's response due 2/11/2019; plaintiff's reply due 2/26/2019. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; by Tammy Condon The United States Attorney and also served the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration - Office of the Regional Chief Counsel Region V served on September 18 2018. (Schuessler, Thomas) Modified on 9/19/2018 (blr).
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; by Tammy Condon The Attorney General of the United States served on September 18 2018. (Schuessler, Thomas) Modified on 9/19/2018 (blr).
September 18, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Tammy Condon ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2923293) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schuessler, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Condon v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Condon
Represented By: Thomas A Schuessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?