345 Property Owner LLC v. United States Postal Service

Plaintiff: 345 Property Owner LLC
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Case Number: 2:2018cv01476
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 Minute Order. Telephonic Status Conference held 11/6/2018 before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. The Court will address the motion to dismiss prior to any additional scheduling. The Court grants the parties stipulated motion for an extension of time. The plaintiff's brief in opposition to the motion to dismiss is now due 12/7/2018. (Tape #11:01:53-11:06:26) (blr)
November 6, 2018 Stipulated ORAL MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Opposition by 345 Property Owner LLC. (see #7 Minutes) (blr)
October 25, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/6/2018 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. The parties are to call the Court's conference line at 877-336-1839 and use access code 5188910# to join the call. (cc: all counsel)(blr)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support filed by United States Postal Service re #5 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 USPS Motion to Dismiss Unpublished Cases)(Flaherty, Maura)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by United States Postal Service. (Flaherty, Maura)
October 12, 2018 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (blr)
October 1, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants. Answer due October 23, 2018. (aeiw)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 10/01/2018 granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due October 23, 2018. (cc: all counsel) (aeiw)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flaherty, Maura)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by 345 Property Owner LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Van Schyndle, Eric)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by United States Postal Service. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Flaherty, Maura)
September 21, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Postal Service from Milwaukee County Courthouse, Case Number: 2018SC029156 with attached state court documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(Knepel, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 345 Property Owner LLC v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 345 Property Owner LLC
Represented By: Averi A Niemuth
Represented By: Eric J Van Schyndle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Susan M Knepel
Represented By: Maura S Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?