Schiller v. Ardagh Glass Inc
Plaintiff: McKaylin Schiller
Defendant: Ardagh Glass Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01487
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The court finding good cause, the motion for extension of time (ECF No. #7 ) is granted. Ardagh Glass Inc., shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than December 14, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 11/16/2018 (cc: all counsel) (mlm)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 11/15/2018. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin for all further proceedings. Judge J P Stadtmueller no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Ardagh Glass Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Nickels, Christopher)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ardagh Glass Inc. (Nickels, Christopher)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Ardagh Glass Inc. (Nickels, Christopher)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L Nickels on behalf of Ardagh Glass Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Christopher L. Nickels (Nickels, Christopher)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Mihelich, Robert)
September 24, 2018 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (asc)
September 24, 2018 Summons Issued as to Ardagh Glass Inc. (asc)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by McKaylin Schiller (Mihelich, Robert)
September 24, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by McKaylin Schiller. (Mihelich, Robert)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Ardagh Glass Inc. by McKaylin Schiller. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2927587) (Attachments: #1 Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Complaint Exhibit B, #3 Complaint Exhibit C)(Mihelich, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2018: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schiller v. Ardagh Glass Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ardagh Glass Inc
Represented By: Christopher L Nickels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McKaylin Schiller
Represented By: Robert M Mihelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?