EEOC v. Fabricare Specialists of Wisconsin Inc
Plaintiff: EEOC
Defendant: Fabricare Specialists of Wisconsin, Inc., d/b/a Carriage Cleaners and Fabricare Specialists of Wisconsin Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01490
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Fabricare Specialists of Wisconsin Inc.(Kamins, Scott)
November 5, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge David E Jones no longer assigned to the case due to non-consent. (kah)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Fabricare Specialists of Wisconsin Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Kamins, Scott)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fabricare Specialists of Wisconsin Inc - Waiver sent on 9/24/2018. (Carter, Leslie)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by EEOC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Carter, Leslie)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 9/26/18. Plaintiff must file proof of service of the complaint or a report on the status of service for each defendant within 45 days of the date of this order. Please note that there is no document attached to this order. (cc: all counsel)(kah)
September 24, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Fabricare Specialists of Wisconsin, Inc., d/b/a Carriage Cleaners by EEOC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carter, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EEOC v. Fabricare Specialists of Wisconsin Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabricare Specialists of Wisconsin, Inc., d/b/a Carriage Cleaners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabricare Specialists of Wisconsin Inc
Represented By: Scott V Kamins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EEOC
Represented By: Leslie N Carter
Represented By: Jean P Kamp
Represented By: Gregory M Gochanour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?