Carson v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Christopher S Carson
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, USCIS District 14 Chicago, Department of Homeland Security, L Francis Cissna, Matthew Krueger, Eddie Hout, Kirstjen Michele Nielsen, Officer TX0351, Director Kathy A Baran, Mirash Dedvukaj and Jefferson Sessions
Case Number: 2:2018cv01571
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 11/30/2018. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Carson's expedited motion for alternative dispute resolution conference hearing (ECF No. #27 ) is denied. (cc: all counsel) (mlm)
November 30, 2018 Filing 29 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Christopher S Carson re #27 Expedited MOTION for Consideration of ADR order ., REPLY filed by Christopher S Carson ., BRIEF in Opposition filed by Christopher S Carson . (Carson, Christopher)
November 29, 2018 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Defendants re #27 Expedited MOTION for Consideration of ADR order . (Larsen, Christian)
November 28, 2018 Filing 27 Expedited MOTION for Consideration of ADR order by Christopher S Carson. (Carson, Christopher)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 11/16/2018. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the defendants' motion to stay discovery (ECF No. #22 ) is granted. All discovery is stayed through the completion of a pretrial conference held pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Carson's motion for oral argument (ECF No. #25 ) is denied. (cc: all counsel) (mlm)
November 16, 2018 Filing 25 Expedited MOTION FOR HEARING ON MOTION BY THE DEFENDANTS FOR STAY OF DISCOVERY by Christopher S Carson. (Carson, Christopher)
November 16, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher S Carson (Carson, Christopher)
November 15, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Christopher S Carson re #22 MOTION to Stay Discovery . (Carson, Christopher)
November 14, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Stay Discovery by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Larsen, Christian)
November 14, 2018 Filing 21 REQUEST by Christopher S Carson for Production of Documents. (Carson, Christopher)
November 14, 2018 Filing 20 DISREGARD ENTRY-FILED IN ERRORREQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Christopher S Carson, Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by Christopher S Carson served upon Officer Eddie Hout on 10-31-2018 (Carson, Christopher) Modified on 11/19/2018 pursuant to a phone call from Attorney Carson. (mlm).
November 14, 2018 Filing 19 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by Christopher S Carson (Carson, Christopher)
November 14, 2018 Filing 18 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by Christopher S Carson served upon Kathy Baran on 10-31-2018 (Carson, Christopher)
November 14, 2018 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (mlm)
November 13, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian R Larsen on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: AUSA Chris R. Larsen (Larsen, Christian)
November 8, 2018 Filing 16 ATTACHMENTS in Subpoena form for Document Production by Christopher S Carson. (Carson, Christopher)
November 6, 2018 Filing 15 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Christopher S Carson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Carson, Christopher)
October 31, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT Corrected, with Correct Parties against All Defendants filed by Christopher S Carson.(Carson, Christopher)
October 31, 2018 SECOND NOTICE - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days (mlm)
October 31, 2018 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to Plaintiff requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (mlm)
October 31, 2018 Summons Issued as to Kathy A Baran, Eddie Hout, Officer TX0351. (mlm)
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Warwick, Lisa)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa T Warwick on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: AUSA Lisa T. Warwick (Warwick, Lisa)
October 19, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Christopher S Carson (Carson, Christopher)
October 19, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Christopher S Carson (Carson, Christopher)
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Christopher S Carson (Carson, Christopher)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT ADDING ADDITIONAL PARTIES against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kathy A Baran, Eddie Hout, Officer TX0351 filed by Christopher S Carson.(Carson, Christopher)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher S Carson. United States Attorney Eastern District of Wisconsin served on 10/17/2018. (Carson, Christopher)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher S Carson. Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III served on 10/11/2018. (Carson, Christopher)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher S Carson. Christopher S Carson served on 10/11/2018. (Carson, Christopher)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher S Carson. Department of Homeland Security served on 10/11/2018. (Carson, Christopher)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher S Carson. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 10/11/2018. (Carson, Christopher)
October 16, 2018 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney Matthew D. Krueger. (mlm)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Christopher S Carson (Carson, Christopher)
October 10, 2018 Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security, USCIS District 14 Chicago, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (mlm)
October 9, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in the Nature of Mandamus against All Defendants by Christopher S Carson. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2938023) (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to DHS, #2 Summons Summons to USCIS, #3 Summons Summons to Chicago USCIS, #4 Summons Summons to DOJ)(Carson, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2018: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carson v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS District 14 Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Francis Cissna
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Represented By: Christian R Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Krueger
Represented By: Christian R Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Hout
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Represented By: Christian R Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Michele Nielsen
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Represented By: Christian R Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer TX0351
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Represented By: Christian R Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Kathy A Baran
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Represented By: Christian R Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirash Dedvukaj
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Represented By: Christian R Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Sessions
Represented By: Christian R Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher S Carson
Represented By: Christopher S Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?