Schofield v. Potawatomi Casino Hotel
Plaintiff: Trina Schofield
Defendant: Potawatomi Casino Hotel and Forest County Potawatomi Community
Case Number: 2:2018cv01676
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Trina Schofield - Waiver sent on 12/11/2018. (Radtke, Sandra)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rufino Gaytan, III on behalf of Forest County Potawatomi Community. Attorney(s) appearing: Rufino Gaytan III (Gaytan, Rufino)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Trina Schofield.(Radtke, Sandra)
November 6, 2018 Summons Issued as to Potawatomi Casino Hotel. (jcl)
October 22, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Trina schofield by Trina schofield. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2950132) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Radtke, Sandra) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/22/2018) (jcl). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/22/2018) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schofield v. Potawatomi Casino Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina Schofield
Represented By: Sandra Graf Radtke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Potawatomi Casino Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest County Potawatomi Community
Represented By: Rufino Gaytan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?