Friends of the Black River Forest Inc v. United States Environmental Protection Agency

Plaintiff: Friends of the Black River Forest Inc
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 2:2018cv01737
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2019 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Judge Pamela Pepper. Parties wishing to appear by phone may do so by calling the court's conference line at 888-557-8511 and using access code 4893665#. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 4/3/2019. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by United States Environmental Protection Agency.(Larsen, Christian)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/11/2018 re #6 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Other Responsive Pleading. The court GRANTS the unopposed motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the United States Environmental Protection Agency to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on December 19, 2018. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Larsen, Christian)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by Friends of the Black River Forest Inc served upon Environmental Protection Agency on 11/6/18 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service by Certified Mail)(Westerberg, Christa) Modified on 11/16/2018 (amb).
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Friends of the Black River Forest Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Dumas, Aaron)
November 2, 2018 Summons Issued as to United States Environmental Protection Agency. (amb)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Friends of the Black River Forest Inc. (Dumas, Aaron)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron G Dumas on behalf of Friends of the Black River Forest Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Aaron G. Dumas (Dumas, Aaron)
October 31, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Environmental Protection Agency by Friends of the Black River Forest Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2958474) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Westerberg, Christa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of the Black River Forest Inc v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Black River Forest Inc
Represented By: Christa O Westerberg
Represented By: Aaron G Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Christian R Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?