Dewey et al v. Bechthold et al
Plaintiff: The Separate Trusts for Ian Dewey, The Nancy Dewey 2015 NEA Grantor Retained Annuity Trust, The Sheamus Dewey Irrevocable Trust, The Erin Dewey Irrevocable Trust, Erin Dewey, The John D Dewey Living Trust, The Abigail Dewey Irrevocable Trust, Nancy Dewey, The John D Dewey Irrevocable Children's Trust, Abigail Dewey, The Irrevocable Trust for the Grandchildren of Nancy and Douglas Dewey, The Abigail Dewey Descendants Trust, The Nancy Dewey Living Trust, The Ian Dewey Irrevocable Trust, The Ian Dewey Descendants Trust, John Dewey, The Nancy Dewey 2015 P&D Grantor Retained Annuity Trust, Sheamus Dewey, The Sheamus Dewey Descendants Trust and The Erin Dewey Descendants Trust
Defendant: John G Sorenson, Payne & Dolan Inc, Timberstone of Richfield Inc, Zenith Tech Inc, Mark Filmanowicz, Northeast Asphalt Inc, Construction Resources Management Inc, David Bechthold and Kurt Bechthold
Case Number: 2:2018cv01739
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 1/2/2019. (cc: all counsel)(kmm)
December 12, 2018 Due to non-consent this case has been randomly reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (blr)
December 11, 2018 Filing 21 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by David Bechthold, Kurt Bechthold, Construction Resources Management Inc, Mark Filmanowicz, Northeast Asphalt Inc, Payne & Dolan Inc, Timberstone of Richfield Inc, Zenith Tech Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Mittal, Anne-Louise)
December 11, 2018 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE Statement by David Bechthold, Kurt Bechthold, Construction Resources Management Inc, Mark Filmanowicz, Northeast Asphalt Inc, Payne & Dolan Inc, Timberstone of Richfield Inc, Zenith Tech Inc. (Mittal, Anne-Louise)
November 20, 2018 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANTS requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
November 20, 2018 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John G Sorenson - Waiver sent on 11/14/2018. (Kravit, Stephen)
November 20, 2018 Filing 18 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Abigail Dewey, Erin Dewey, John Dewey, Nancy Dewey, Sheamus Dewey, The Abigail Dewey Descendants Trust, The Abigail Dewey Irrevocable Trust, The Erin Dewey Descendants Trust, The Erin Dewey Irrevocable Trust, The Ian Dewey Descendants Trust, The Ian Dewey Irrevocable Trust, The Irrevocable Trust for the Grandchildren of Nancy and Douglas Dewey, The John D Dewey Irrevocable Children's Trust, The John D Dewey Living Trust, The Nancy Dewey 2015 NEA Grantor Retained Annuity Trust, The Nancy Dewey 2015 P&D Grantor Retained Annuity Trust, The Nancy Dewey Living Trust, The Separate Trusts for Ian Dewey, The Sheamus Dewey Descendants Trust, The Sheamus Dewey Irrevocable Trust. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Kravit, Stephen)
November 19, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip C Babler on behalf of David Bechthold, Kurt Bechthold, Construction Resources Management Inc, Mark Filmanowicz, Northeast Asphalt Inc, Payne & Dolan Inc, Timberstone of Richfield Inc, Zenith Tech Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Thomas L. Shriner, Jr., Bryan B. House, Philip C. Babler, Anne-Louise T. Mittal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service of notice of appearance on non-ECF participant)(Babler, Philip)
November 15, 2018 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Timberstone of Richfield Inc - Waiver sent on 11/14/2018. (Kravit, Stephen)
November 15, 2018 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Zenith Tech Inc - Waiver sent on 11/14/2018. (Kravit, Stephen)
November 15, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Construction Resources Management Inc - Waiver sent on 11/14/2018. (Kravit, Stephen)
November 15, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Northeast Asphalt Inc - Waiver sent on 11/14/2018. (Kravit, Stephen)
November 15, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Payne & Dolan Inc - Waiver sent on 11/14/2018. (Kravit, Stephen)
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Bechthold - Waiver sent on 11/14/2018. (Kravit, Stephen)
November 15, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mark Filmanowicz - Waiver sent on 11/14/2018. (Kravit, Stephen)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kurt Bechthold - Waiver sent on 11/14/2018. (Kravit, Stephen)
November 2, 2018 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)
November 1, 2018 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Kravit, Stephen)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Gina Edwards (Attachments: #1 Redacted Declaration of Gina Edwards, #2 Exhibit A - SEALED 3/17/2016 Email and Attachments, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted 3/17/2016 Email and Attachments, #4 Exhibit B - List of Properties, #5 Exhibit C - List of Properties, #6 Exhibit D - List of Properties, #7 Exhibit E - List of Properties, #8 Exhibit F - List of Properties)This document and/or certain attachments are SEALED and only viewable by permission of the court(Kravit, Stephen)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Brian Lutz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 12/4/2015 Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B - 1/22/2016 Correspondence, #3 Exhibit C - SEALED 3/17/2016 Email and attachments, #4 Exhibit C - Redacted 3/17/2016 Email and attachments, #5 Exhibit D - 7/29/2016 Correspondence, #6 Exhibit E - 11/30/2016 Correspondence, #7 Exhibit F - 12/7/2016 Correspondence, #8 Exhibit G - 2/13/2017 Correspondence, #9 Exhibit H - 4/27/2017 Correspondence, #10 Exhibit I - 5/2/2017 Correspondence, #11 Exhibit J - 5/22/2017 Correspondence, #12 Exhibit K - 7/27/2017 Correspondence, #13 Exhibit L - SEALED 8/8/2017 Correspondence, #14 Exhibit L - Redacted 8/8/2017 Correspondence, #15 Exhibit M - 1/12/2018 Correspondence, #16 Exhibit N - 1/24/2018 Correspondence, #17 Exhibit O - 2/21/2018 Correspondence)This document and/or certain attachments are SEALED and only viewable by permission of the court(Kravit, Stephen)
November 1, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Joel Nettesheim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Curriculum Vitae, #2 Exhibit B - Glomski Curriculum Vitae, #3 Exhibit C - List of Reviewed Financials, #4 Exhibit D - Document Requests, #5 Exhibit E - Document Requests)(Kravit, Stephen)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #3 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Or, Alternatively, An Order to Permit Inspection and Copying of the Defendant Companies' Accounting Records . (Kravit, Stephen)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Or, Alternatively, An MOTION for Order to Permit Inspection and Copying of the Defendant Companies' Accounting Records by All Plaintiffs. (Kravit, Stephen). Added MOTION for Order on 11/1/2018 (asc).
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Document Certain Documents or Portions of Documents by All Plaintiffs. (Kravit, Stephen)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Redacted with Jury Demand; against All Plaintiffs by The Ian Dewey Irrevocable Trust, The John D. Dewey Living Trust, The Nancy Dewey Living Trust, Sheamus Dewey, Nancy Dewey, Erin Dewey, The Separate Trusts for Ian Dewey, The Abigail Dewey Descendant's Trust, John Dewey, The Nancy Dewey 2015 NEA Grantor Retained Annuity Trust, The Abigail Dewey Irrevocable Trust, The Sheamus Dewey Irrevocable Trust, The Sheamus Dewey Descendant's Trust, The Erin Dewey Descendant's Trust, The Ian Dewey Descendant's Trust, The John D. Dewey Irrevocable Children's Trust, The Nancy Dewey 2015 P&D Grantor Retained Annuity Trust, The Erin Dewey Irrevocable Trust, Abigail Dewey, The Irrevocable Trust for the Grandchildren of Nancy and Douglas Dewey. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2958951) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Complaint Sealed Complaint)This document and/or certain attachments are SEALED and only viewable by permission of the court(Kravit, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dewey et al v. Bechthold et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Separate Trusts for Ian Dewey
Represented By: Stuart J Check
Represented By: Benjamin R Prinsen
Represented By: Brian M Lutz
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Nancy Dewey 2015 NEA Grantor Retained Annuity Trust
Represented By: Stuart J Check
Represented By: Benjamin R Prinsen
Represented By: Brian M Lutz
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Sheamus Dewey Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: Stuart J Check
Represented By: Benjamin R Prinsen
Represented By: Brian M Lutz
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Erin Dewey Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: Stuart J Check
Represented By: Benjamin R Prinsen
Represented By: Brian M Lutz
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Dewey
Represented By: Stuart J Check
Represented By: Benjamin R Prinsen
Represented By: Brian M Lutz
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The John D Dewey Living Trust
Represented By: Stuart J Check
Represented By: Benjamin R Prinsen
Represented By: Brian M Lutz
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Abigail Dewey Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: Stuart J Check
Represented By: Benjamin R Prinsen
Represented By: Brian M Lutz
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Dewey
Represented By: Stuart J Check
Represented By: Benjamin R Prinsen
Represented By: Brian M Lutz
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The John D Dewey Irrevocable Children's Trust
Represented By: Stuart J Check
Represented By: Benjamin R Prinsen
Represented By: Brian M Lutz
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Dewey
Represented By: Stuart J Check
Represented By: Benjamin R Prinsen
Represented By: Brian M Lutz
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Irrevocable Trust for the Grandchildren of Nancy and Douglas Dewey
Represented By: Stuart J Check
Represented By: Benjamin R Prinsen
Represented By: Brian M Lutz
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Abigail Dewey Descendants Trust
Represented By: Stuart J Check
Represented By: Benjamin R Prinsen
Represented By: Brian M Lutz
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Nancy Dewey Living Trust
Represented By: Stuart J Check
Represented By: Benjamin R Prinsen
Represented By: Brian M Lutz
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ian Dewey Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: Stuart J Check
Represented By: Benjamin R Prinsen
Represented By: Brian M Lutz
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ian Dewey Descendants Trust
Represented By: Stuart J Check
Represented By: Benjamin R Prinsen
Represented By: Brian M Lutz
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dewey
Represented By: Stuart J Check
Represented By: Benjamin R Prinsen
Represented By: Brian M Lutz
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Nancy Dewey 2015 P&D Grantor Retained Annuity Trust
Represented By: Stuart J Check
Represented By: Benjamin R Prinsen
Represented By: Brian M Lutz
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheamus Dewey
Represented By: Stuart J Check
Represented By: Benjamin R Prinsen
Represented By: Brian M Lutz
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Sheamus Dewey Descendants Trust
Represented By: Stuart J Check
Represented By: Benjamin R Prinsen
Represented By: Brian M Lutz
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Erin Dewey Descendants Trust
Represented By: Stuart J Check
Represented By: Benjamin R Prinsen
Represented By: Brian M Lutz
Represented By: Stephen E Kravit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G Sorenson
Represented By: Dean P Laing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payne & Dolan Inc
Represented By: Bryan B House
Represented By: Thomas L Shriner, Jr
Represented By: Philip C Babler
Represented By: Anne-Louise Treveni Mittal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timberstone of Richfield Inc
Represented By: Bryan B House
Represented By: Thomas L Shriner, Jr
Represented By: Philip C Babler
Represented By: Anne-Louise Treveni Mittal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenith Tech Inc
Represented By: Bryan B House
Represented By: Thomas L Shriner, Jr
Represented By: Philip C Babler
Represented By: Anne-Louise Treveni Mittal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Filmanowicz
Represented By: Bryan B House
Represented By: Thomas L Shriner, Jr
Represented By: Philip C Babler
Represented By: Anne-Louise Treveni Mittal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Asphalt Inc
Represented By: Bryan B House
Represented By: Thomas L Shriner, Jr
Represented By: Philip C Babler
Represented By: Anne-Louise Treveni Mittal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Construction Resources Management Inc
Represented By: Bryan B House
Represented By: Thomas L Shriner, Jr
Represented By: Philip C Babler
Represented By: Anne-Louise Treveni Mittal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bechthold
Represented By: Bryan B House
Represented By: Thomas L Shriner, Jr
Represented By: Philip C Babler
Represented By: Anne-Louise Treveni Mittal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Bechthold
Represented By: Bryan B House
Represented By: Thomas L Shriner, Jr
Represented By: Philip C Babler
Represented By: Anne-Louise Treveni Mittal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?