Raffel Systems LLC v. Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc et al

Plaintiff: Raffel Systems LLC
Defendant: Man Wah Holdings LTD., Inc., Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc, XYZ Companies 1-10 and Man Wah (USA) Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01765
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Lynn Adelman
1 Judge: David E Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order 46 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 1/2/2019. Parties are advised to be prepared to discuss #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for February 1, 2019. (cc: all counsel)(JDG)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order 45 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 1/2/2019. Parties are advised to submit any opposition to #25 Amended Motion to Restrict Document and #37 Motion to Restrict Document, no later than January 11, 2019. (cc: all counsel)(JDG)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order 44 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 1/2/2019. For good cause shown, the Court will grant #34 Unopposed Motion to Seal Document. (cc: all counsel) (JDG)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order 43 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 1/2/2019 granting #36 Motion to File Corrected Brief. (cc: all counsel) (JDG)
December 31, 2018 42 DECLARATION of Michael L. Lindinger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11)(Lindinger, Michael)
December 31, 2018 41 STATEMENT by Man Wah (USA) Inc, Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc of Wang Xiadong. (Hnath, Gary)
December 31, 2018 40 DECLARATION of Linhua Huang (Attachments: #1 Restricted Declaration of Linhua Huang)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Hnath, Gary)
December 31, 2018 39 DECLARATION of Tommy Wong (Attachments: #1 Restricted Declaration of Tommy Wong)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Hnath, Gary)
December 31, 2018 38 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Man Wah (USA) Inc, Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc re #3 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: #1 Restricted Corrected Opposition to Raffel Systems, LLC's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Hnath, Gary)
December 31, 2018 37 MOTION to Restrict Document by Man Wah (USA) Inc, Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hnath, Gary)
December 31, 2018 36 Unopposed MOTION to File a Corrected Brief by Man Wah (USA) Inc, Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hnath, Gary)
December 31, 2018 35 DECLARATION of Ben Vollmer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unredacted)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Leone, Joseph)
December 31, 2018 34 Unopposed MOTION to Restrict Document by Raffel Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Seal Confidential Documents)(Leone, Joseph)
December 31, 2018 33 DECLARATION of Ben Vollmer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - REDACTED)(Leone, Joseph)
December 31, 2018 32 DECLARATION of Paul Stangl (Leone, Joseph)
December 31, 2018 31 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Raffel Systems LLC re #3 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Leone, Joseph)
December 26, 2018 30 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2019 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge David E Jones. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 1/25/2019. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at 877-848-7030 and use access code 3866147# to join the call. (Attachments: #1 Trial procedures, deposition practices, and case management and scheduling guidance)(cc: all counsel)(amb)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 29 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David E Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Lynn Adelman no longer assigned to case signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/26/18. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
December 21, 2018 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Shen Wang on behalf of Man Wah (USA) Inc, Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Shen Wang (Wang, Shen)
December 21, 2018 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Hao Tan on behalf of Man Wah (USA) Inc, Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Hao Tan (Tan, Hao)
December 19, 2018 26 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Man Wah (USA) Inc, Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Wuest, Matthew)
December 19, 2018 25 Amended MOTION to Restrict Document previously filed as document #19 and inadvertently identified as Unopposed by Man Wah (USA) Inc, Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Hnath, Gary)
December 19, 2018 24 DECLARATION of Michael L. Lindinger in Support of Opposition to Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Lindinger, Michael)
December 19, 2018 23 STATEMENT by Man Wah (USA) Inc, Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc of Wang Xiadong in Support of Opposition to Motion for a Temporary Restraining order and Preliminary Injunction. (Hnath, Gary)
December 18, 2018 22 DECLARATION of Linhua Huang in Support of Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Restricted Declaration of Linhua Huang in Support of Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Hnath, Gary)
December 18, 2018 21 DECLARATION of Tommy Wong in Support of Opposition to Motion for A Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Restricted Declaration of Tommy Wong in Support of Opposition to Motion for A Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Hnath, Gary)
December 18, 2018 20 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Man Wah (USA) Inc, Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc re #3 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: #1 Restricted Opposition to Raffel Systems, LLC'S Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Hnath, Gary)
December 18, 2018 19 See docket #25 Unopposed MOTION to Restrict Document by Man Wah (USA) Inc, Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hnath, Gary) Modified on 12/19/2018 (jcl).
December 18, 2018 18 ANSWER to Complaint AND COUNTERCLAIM against Raffel Systems, LLC with Jury Demand filed by Man Wah (USA) Inc, Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc . (Hnath, Gary)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order 17 ORDER Granting Extension of Case Deadline #15 signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/5/18. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
December 4, 2018 16 DISCLOSURE Statement by Man Wah (USA) Inc, Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc. (Wuest, Matthew)
December 3, 2018 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Case Deadlines by Man Wah (USA) Inc, Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Case Deadlines)(Wuest, Matthew) Modified on 12/4/2018 (jcl).
December 3, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M Wuest on behalf of Man Wah (USA) Inc, Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew M. Wuest (Wuest, Matthew)
December 3, 2018 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Gregor on behalf of Man Wah (USA) Inc, Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Jennifer L. Gregor (Gregor, Jennifer)
November 29, 2018 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Raffel Systems LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Sisk, Tyler)
November 26, 2018 Summons Issued as to Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc. (blr)
November 26, 2018 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raffel Systems LLC. Man Wah (USA) Inc served on 11/13/2018. (Leone, Joseph)
November 21, 2018 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raffel Systems LLC. Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc served on 11/9/2018. (Leone, Joseph)
November 21, 2018 9 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Raffel Systems LLC (Leone, Joseph)
November 21, 2018 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The attached summons was not prepared using the version found on our website - please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. The attached summons is blank - in the future please remember to submit completed summons. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (bx)
November 20, 2018 8 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Raffel Systems LLC (Leone, Joseph)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/13/18 that the court will not act on motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction until the defendants have received notice and an opportunity to respond to the motion. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
November 13, 2018 Summons Reissued as to Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc. (jcl)
November 13, 2018 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Raffel Systems LLC (Sisk, Tyler)
November 9, 2018 5 DISREGARD WILL RE-FILE CORRECTLY MOTION to Amend/Correct 01-21 Summons by Raffel Systems LLC. (Sisk, Tyler) Modified on 11/13/2018 (cms).
November 8, 2018 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Raffel Systems LLC. (Sisk, Tyler)
November 8, 2018 3 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Raffel Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit, #6 Affidavit, #7 Affidavit, #8 Proposed Order)(Sisk, Tyler)
November 8, 2018 Summons Issued as to Man Wah Holdings LTD., Inc.. (jcl)
November 8, 2018 2 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (jcl)
November 8, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
November 8, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against all defendants Man Wah Holdings LTD., Inc. by Raffel Systems LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2964377) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Summons, #22 Summons)(Sisk, Tyler) Modified on 11/26/2018 (amb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raffel Systems LLC v. Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Man Wah Holdings LTD., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Man Wah Holdings LTD Inc
Represented By: Jennifer L Gregor
Represented By: Shen Wang
Represented By: Hao Tan
Represented By: Gary M Hnath
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Man Wah (USA) Inc
Represented By: Jennifer L Gregor
Represented By: Shen Wang
Represented By: Hao Tan
Represented By: Gary M Hnath
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raffel Systems LLC
Represented By: Joseph T Leone
Represented By: David A Casimir
Represented By: Tyler J Sisk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?