Moya v. Walgreen Co

Plaintiff: Carolyn Moya
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Case Number: 2:2018cv01785
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION For Extension of Time for Walgreen Co. to File a Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Walgreen Co. (Noyes, Kelly)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 12/21/18. Interim settlement report due 5/24/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2019; Final settlement report due 9/30/19; Motions in limine and Daubert motions due 10/4/19; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 10/9/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 10/21/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Judge J P Stadtmueller. (cc: all counsel)(kmm)
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 12/19/2018. (Court Reporter John Schindhelm) (nb)
December 17, 2018 Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Carolyn Moya re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Borison, Scott)
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Carolyn Moya. (Borison, Scott)
November 30, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 12/14/2018. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott C Borison on behalf of Carolyn Moya. Attorney(s) appearing: Scott C. Borison (Borison, Scott)
November 28, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge David E Jones no longer assigned to the case. (amb)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Kelly J. Noyes in Support of Defendant Walgreen Co's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint & Request For Jury Trial (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint in Moya v. Aurora Healthcare, Inc.)(Noyes, Kelly)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support filed by Walgreen Co re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Noyes, Kelly)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Walgreen Co. (Noyes, Kelly)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Welcenbach, Robert)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 11/16/18. Consistent with this Court's Case Management and Scheduling Guidance, the parties have stipulated to an extension of time to file a responsive pleading. Defendant's responsive pleading is now due on or before 11/28/2018. NOTE: There is no document attached to this text-only order. (cc: all counsel)(jh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan E Lovern on behalf of Walgreen Co. Attorney(s) appearing: Susan E. Lovern (Lovern, Susan)
November 9, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Walgreen Co. (Noyes, Kelly)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walgreen Co from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 18cv008160 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2966190) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Circuit Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Michelle Vandiver, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Noyes, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moya v. Walgreen Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Latoya Brisbane
Represented By: Cynthia G Burnside
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Moya
Represented By: Robert J Welcenbach
Represented By: Scott C Borison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?