Pathway Engineering Ltd v. PS Furniture Inc

Plaintiff: Pathway Engineering Ltd. and Pathway Engineering Ltd
Defendant: PS Furniture, Inc. and PS Furniture Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01817
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph granting #7 Motion to Stay. (cc: all counsel) (asc)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Staying Proceedings Pending Mediation signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 12/18/2018. (cc: all counsel)(llc)
December 18, 2018 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (asc)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by PS Furniture Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Kirk, Douglas)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Mediation by All Plaintiffs. (Hopkins, Michael)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas M Kirk on behalf of PS Furniture Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Douglas Mitchell Kirk (Kirk, Douglas)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pathway Engineering Ltd. PS Furniture Inc served on 11/28/2018. (Hopkins, Michael)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Pathway Engineering Ltd. (Hopkins, Michael)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Hopkins, Michael)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (asc)
November 19, 2018 Summons Issued as to PS Furniture Inc. (asc)
November 16, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (cms)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against PS Furniture, Inc. by Pathway Engineering Ltd.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2971222) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A - photograph, #4 Exhibit B - photograph, #5 Exhibit C - photograph, #6 Exhibit D - License Agreement, #7 Exhibit E - email, #8 Exhibit F - email, #9 Exhibit G - email)(Hopkins, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pathway Engineering Ltd v. PS Furniture Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pathway Engineering Ltd.
Represented By: Michael T Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pathway Engineering Ltd
Represented By: Michael T Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PS Furniture, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PS Furniture Inc
Represented By: Douglas M Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?