Stenz et al v. Keystone RV Company et al

Plaintiff: Kim Stenz and Gregory Stenz
Defendant: Camping World RV Sales, LLC, Marko Otovic, Keystone RV Company, Chris J Kolbach and Camping World RV Sales LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01820
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John J Laubmeier on behalf of Camping World RV Sales LLC, Chris J Kolbach, Marko Otovic. Attorney(s) appearing: John J. Laubmeier (Laubmeier, John)
December 10, 2018 Due to non-consent, this case has been randomly reassigned to Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (blr)
December 10, 2018 14 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Keystone RV Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Gasper, Trevor)
December 6, 2018 13 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Keystone RV Company.(Gasper, Trevor)
November 30, 2018 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Thompson, Gary)
November 30, 2018 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary W Thompson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Gary W Thompson (Thompson, Gary)
November 28, 2018 10 ANSWER filed by ATTACHMENTS by Camping World RV Sales LLC, Chris J Kolbach, Marko Otovic (originally filed in Waukesha County Circuit Court 11/16/18). (Farnam, Norman) Modified on 11/29/2018 (blr).
November 28, 2018 9 NOTICE by Camping World RV Sales LLC, Chris J Kolbach, Marko Otovic Notice of Filing of Answer (Farnam, Norman)
November 28, 2018 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by Camping World RV Sales LLC. (Farnam, Norman)
November 28, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Norman D Farnam on behalf of Camping World RV Sales LLC, Chris J Kolbach, Marko Otovic. Attorney(s) appearing: Norman D. Farnam (Farnam, Norman)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER Approving Stipulation re #4 Stipulation filed by Keystone RV Company signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 11/26/2018. Answer deadline is now December 7, 2018. (cc: all counsel)(aeiw)
November 26, 2018 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Keystone RV Company. (Gasper, Trevor)
November 26, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Q Gasper on behalf of Keystone RV Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Trevor Q. Gasper (Gasper, Trevor)
November 21, 2018 4 STIPULATION for Extension to Answer by Keystone RV Company. (Wojcicki, Paul)
November 19, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
November 16, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E Wojcicki on behalf of Keystone RV Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Paul E. Wojcikcki (Wojcicki, Paul)
November 16, 2018 2 NOTICE by Keystone RV Company Civil Cover Sheet (Wojcicki, Paul)
November 16, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Keystone RV Company from Waukesha County Circuit Court, Case Number: 30301, 30303 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2971485) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Wojcicki, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stenz et al v. Keystone RV Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Stenz
Represented By: Gary W Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Stenz
Represented By: Gary W Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camping World RV Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marko Otovic
Represented By: John J Laubmeier
Represented By: Norman D Farnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystone RV Company
Represented By: Paul E Wojcicki
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris J Kolbach
Represented By: John J Laubmeier
Represented By: Norman D Farnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camping World RV Sales LLC
Represented By: John J Laubmeier
Represented By: Norman D Farnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?