Szczerba v. CMM Trucking LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gregory P. Szczerba and Gregory P Szczerba
Defendant: Mark A. Szczerba, Jr., cmm trucking, llc, three m trucking, llc, CMM Trucking LLC, Three M Trucking LLC and Mark A Szczerba, Jr
Case Number: 2:2018cv01821
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 49:31105
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CMM Trucking LLC, Mark A Szczerba, Jr, Three M Trucking LLC.(Baird, Brian)
January 17, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Three M Trucking LLC - Waiver sent on 1/8/2019. (Baird, Brian)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CMM Trucking LLC - Waiver sent on 1/8/2019. (Baird, Brian)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mark A Szczerba, Jr - Waiver sent on 1/8/2019. (Baird, Brian)
January 8, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge David E Jones no longer assigned to the case. (amb)
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Baird, Brian)
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D Baird on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Brian D. Baird (Baird, Brian)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT Of Service by Gregory P Szczerba. (Kent, Adam)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Gregory P Szczerba. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Kent, Adam)
December 21, 2018 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to plaintiff requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge David E. Jones be filed within 14 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (amb)
December 21, 2018 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (amb)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Gregory P Szczerba (Kent, Adam)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Gregory P Szczerba (Kent, Adam)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Gregory P Szczerba (Kent, Adam)
November 20, 2018 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been added - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. Added proper punctuation to party names and removed party addresses - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance. (amb)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 11/20/2018. Plaintiff must file proof of service of the complaint or a report on the status of service for each defendant within 45 days of the date of this order. There is no document attached to this order. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
November 19, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Gregory P. Szczerba. (Kent, Adam)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Gregory P. Szczerba. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2972264) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kent, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Szczerba v. CMM Trucking LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Szczerba, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cmm trucking, llc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: three m trucking, llc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMM Trucking LLC
Represented By: Brian D Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three M Trucking LLC
Represented By: Brian D Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A Szczerba, Jr
Represented By: Brian D Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory P. Szczerba
Represented By: Adam M Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory P Szczerba
Represented By: Adam M Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?