Russo Trading Company Inc v. Donnelly Distribution LLC

Plaintiff: Russo Trading Company Inc
Defendant: Donnelly Distribution LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01851
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order 19 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 1/18/2019: Interim Settlement Report due by 7/1/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 7/5/2019; Final Settlement Report due by 10/28/2019; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 11/1/2019; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 11/6/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 11/18/2019 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
January 16, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #18 Stipulation filed by Russo Trading Company Inc ; The proposed order should be filed as an attachment to the stipulation. Please ensure that the proposed order has been emailed to the proposed email box for the assigned judge in Word or WordPerfect format. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
January 15, 2019 18 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Russo Trading Company Inc. (Reynolds, Thomas)
January 11, 2019 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 1/11/2019 (Court Reporter Rich Ehrlich) (km)
January 11, 2019 16 ANSWER to Complaint AND COUNTERCLAIM against Russo Trading Company, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Donnelly Distribution LLC . (Foley, Mark)
January 8, 2019 15 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Russo Trading Company Inc. (Reynolds, Thomas)
December 27, 2018 14 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Donnelly Distribution LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.)(Waterstreet, Derek)
December 20, 2018 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 1/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 1/8/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
December 19, 2018 12 STIPULATION (JOINT) to Extend Time for Defendant Donnelly Distribution LLC to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Donnelly Distribution LLC. (Foley, Mark)
December 19, 2018 11 DISCLOSURE Statement by Donnelly Distribution LLC. (Foley, Mark)
December 19, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek J Waterstreet on behalf of Donnelly Distribution LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Derek J. Waterstreet (Waterstreet, Derek)
December 19, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Thome on behalf of Donnelly Distribution LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew J. Thome (Thome, Matthew)
December 19, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark F Foley on behalf of Donnelly Distribution LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Mark F. Foley (Foley, Mark)
December 6, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Russo Trading Company Inc. Donnelly Distribution LLC served on 11/30/2018. (Reynolds, Thomas)
December 6, 2018 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Russo Trading Company Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Reynolds, Thomas)
November 27, 2018 5 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (asc)
November 27, 2018 Summons Issued as to Donnelly Distribution LLC. (asc)
November 26, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E Troupis Ferguson on behalf of Russo Trading Company Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Sarah Troupis Ferguson (Troupis Ferguson, Sarah)
November 26, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Adelson on behalf of Russo Trading Company Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeremy Adelson (Adelson, Jeremy)
November 26, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (cms)
November 26, 2018 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Russo Trading Company Inc. (Reynolds, Thomas)
November 26, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Donnelly Distribution LLC by Russo Trading Company Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2975890) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Summons)(Reynolds, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russo Trading Company Inc v. Donnelly Distribution LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russo Trading Company Inc
Represented By: Sarah E Troupis Ferguson
Represented By: Thomas S Reynolds, II
Represented By: Jeremy Adelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnelly Distribution LLC
Represented By: Mark F Foley
Represented By: Derek J Waterstreet
Represented By: Matthew J Thome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?