Thomas v. Law Office of Keith S Shindler Ltd et al

Plaintiff: Brandi Thomas
Defendant: Law Office of Keith S. Shindler, Ltd., Cavalry SPV I LLC, Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC and Law Office of Keith S Shindler Ltd
Case Number: 2:2018cv01916
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Law Office of Keith S Shindler Ltd - Waiver sent on 12/20/2018. (Eldridge, Mark)
December 31, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC - Waiver sent on 12/20/2018. (Eldridge, Mark)
December 31, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cavalry SPV I LLC - Waiver sent on 12/20/2018. (Eldridge, Mark)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 12/13/2018. For the reasons stated therein, and for good cause shown, the plaintiff's motion to stay her motion for class certification, ECF No. #3 , and motion for relief from the Local Rules setting an automatic briefing schedule, ECF No. #3 , are GRANTED. The plaintiff's motion for class certification, ECF No. #3 , is TERMINATED for administrative purposes only. Briefing on the plaintiff's class cert motion is STAYED until the date to be set at the Rule 16 scheduling conference. NOTE: There is no document attached to this text-only order. (cc: all counsel) (jh)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Brandi Thomas. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Eldridge, Mark)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 12/7/18. Plaintiff must file proof of service of the complaint/petition or a report on the status of service for each defendant within 45 days of the date of this order. Please note that there is no document attached to this order. (cc: all counsel)(kah)
December 7, 2018 Summons Issued as to Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC, Cavalry SPV I LLC, Law Office of Keith S Shindler Ltd. (kah)
December 6, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Certify Class (Damasco, Campbell-Ewald), Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Relief from memorandum, supporting documents, and automatic briefing requirements, Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Stay the motion for class certification until the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference by Brandi Thomas. (Eldridge, Mark)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Brandi Thomas. (Eldridge, Mark)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (class action) with Jury Demand; against Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC, Cavalry SPV I LLC, Law Office of Keith S. Shindler, Ltd. by Brandi Thomas. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2983073) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: letter from Defendant to Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit B: letter from Defendant to Plaintiff, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons on Shindler, #5 Summons on CPS, #6 Summons on Cavalry SPV)(Eldridge, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Law Office of Keith S Shindler Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Keith S. Shindler, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavalry SPV I LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Keith S Shindler Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Thomas
Represented By: Mark A Eldridge
Represented By: Jesse Fruchter
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Ben J Slatky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?