O'Boyle v. North Shore Agency LLC

Plaintiff: Anne O'Boyle
Defendant: North Shore Agency LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01921
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Case administratively closed pursuant to Text Only Order (ECF no. 9). (amb)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/8/2019 re #8 Plaintiff's Rule 7(h) Expedited, Non-Dispositive Motion to Close Case Administratively Pending the Filing of a Motion, Stipulation or Notice of Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). The court GRANTS the plaintiff's motion to close the case administratively pending the filing of dismissal documents--which the parties anticipate will be within 45 days. The court ORDERS that this case is administratively closed pending the filing of those documents. The court further ORDERS that when dismissal documents are filed, the court will convert the closure to the resolution required by the pleading. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Stay proceedings pending the filing of a motion, stipulation, or notice of dismissal by Anne O'Boyle. (Eldridge, Mark)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by North Shore Agency LLC - Waiver sent on 12/19/2018. (Eldridge, Mark)
December 20, 2018 NOTICE from the clerk to defendant requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (amb)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M Schwartz on behalf of North Shore Agency LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew M. Schwartz (Schwartz, Andrew)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Anne O'Boyle. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Eldridge, Mark)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/11/2018 re #3 Plaintiff's Rule 7(h) Expedited, Non-Dispositive Motion for Class Certification and Relief from Memorandum, Supporting Documents, and Automatic Briefing Requirements. The court GRANTS the plaintiff's motion to stay the class certification motion until such time as the plaintiff files an amended motion for class certification. The court further GRANTS the plaintiff's motion asking for relief from the automatic briefing schedule required by the local rules for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
December 7, 2018 Summons Issued as to North Shore Agency LLC. (vkb)
December 6, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (cms)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Certify Class (Damasco, Campbell-Ewald), Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Relief from memorandum, supporting documents, and automatic briefing requirements, Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Stay the motion for class certification until the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference by Anne O'Boyle. (Eldridge, Mark)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Anne O'Boyle. (Eldridge, Mark)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (class action) with Jury Demand; against North Shore Agency LLC by Anne O'Boyle. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2984038) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: letter from Defendant to Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Eldridge, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Boyle v. North Shore Agency LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne O'Boyle
Represented By: Mark A Eldridge
Represented By: Ben J Slatky
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Jesse Fruchter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Shore Agency LLC
Represented By: Andrew M Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?