Jihad v. Department of Homeland Security - Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Defendant: Sheriff Dale J Schmidt
Petitioner: Al Halaiga Jihad
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security - Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 2:2018cv01923
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 1/18/2019 re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Al Halaiga Jihad. The Clerk shall update the caption to name Dale J Schmidt as the respondent and terminate all other persons identified as respondents. Sheriff Dale J Schmidt added., Department of Homeland Security - Immigration and Customs Enforcement terminated. No later than March 4, 2019, the respondent shall show cause why the petition for a writ of habeas corpus should not be granted. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Petitioner, Sheriff Dale J Schmidt, US Atty-Milw, DOJ-Wash DC, ICE-Wash DC, DHS-Wash DC)(lz)
January 11, 2019 FILING FEE Received: $5.00, receipt number MK4689-075817. (jcl)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 SECOND LETTER from clerk's office to plaintiff requesting the $5.00 filing fee or completion of the enclosed Prisoner's Petition and Affidavit to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and/or Costs form and his trust account statement. (mlm)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Al Halaiga Jihad. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mlm)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Petitioner re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days; and to either pay the $5 filing fee or file the petition to proceed without prepayment of fees/costs along with his prisoner trust account statement within 21 days. (lz)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 AUTHORIZATION for Release of Institutional Account Information and Payment of Filing Fee. (lz)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC § 2241 filed by Al Halaiga Jihad. (Filing Fee NOT PAID $5) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jihad v. Department of Homeland Security - Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Al Halaiga Jihad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security - Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Dale J Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?