Harris v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Zykita L. Harris and Zykita L Harris
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv01930
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 1/23/2019. (blr)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/22/2019. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David E. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/18/2019. (blr)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties. By 3/18/2019 defendant to file and serve certified administrative record. Plaintiff's brief due 4/29/2019; defendant's response due 6/10/2019; plaintiff's reply due 6/25/2019. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Nancy A Berryhill. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
January 15, 2019 Transmit #1 Complaint and #5 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/11/2019 GRANTING #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Zykita L Harris. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Chewning, Donald)
December 7, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Zykita L. Harris. (Chewning, Donald)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Zykita L. Harris. (Chewning, Donald)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Zykita L. Harris (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit ALJ Decision, #3 Exhibit Appeals Council Order)(Chewning, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zykita L. Harris
Represented By: Donald J Chewning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zykita L Harris
Represented By: Donald J Chewning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?