Sarsour v. Whitaker et al
Plaintiff: Salah Sarsour
Defendant: Lee Francis Cissna and Matthew Whitaker
Case Number: 2:2018cv01939
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Warwick, Lisa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa T Warwick on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: AUSA Lisa T. Warwick (Warwick, Lisa)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Salah Sarsour. Matthew Whitaker served on 12/12/2018. (Hwang Cho, Bonita) Modified on 12/17/2018 (amb).
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Salah Sarsour. Lee Francis Cissna served on 12/12/2018. (Hwang Cho, Bonita) Modified on 12/17/2018 (amb).
December 12, 2018 Summons Issued as to Lee Francis Cissna. (cms)
December 12, 2018 Summons Issued as to Matthew Whitaker. (cms)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Salah Sarsour (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hwang Cho, Bonita)
December 11, 2018 Summons Issued as to Matthew Krueger All Defendants. (asc) Modified on 12/12/2018 (blr).
December 7, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bonita B Hwang Cho on behalf of Salah Sarsour. Attorney(s) appearing: Bonita B Hwang Cho (Hwang Cho, Bonita)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Salah Sarsour. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2985134) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A through C, #3 Summons Summons for Lee Cissna, #4 Summons Summons for Matthew Krueger, #5 Summons Summons for Matthew Whitaker)(Hwang Cho, Bonita)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarsour v. Whitaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salah Sarsour
Represented By: Bonita B Hwang Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Francis Cissna
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Whitaker
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?