Harwood v. Healthcare Technology Enabled Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Harwood
Defendant: Milwaukee Radiologists Ltd SC and Healthcare Technology Enabled Services LLC
Intervenor Defendant: Acuity, a Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv01941
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/23/19. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on 3/5/19 at 1:45 p.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
January 14, 2019 Filing 25 LETTER from J. Craig Jones . (Jones, John)
January 14, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Milwaukee Radiologists Ltd SC re #12 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Intervene . (Wagner, K)
January 11, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by John Craig Jones on behalf of Elizabeth Harwood. Attorney(s) appearing: J. Craig Jones (Jones, John)
January 10, 2019 Filing 22 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by Acuity, a Mutual Insurance Company.(Mirabella, Joseph)
January 10, 2019 Filing 21 LETTER from Attorney Mirabella to Court regarding Intervenor Complaint. (Mirabella, Joseph)
January 10, 2019 Filing 20 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Healthcare Technology Enabled Services LLC re #12 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Intervene . (Noyes, Kelly)
December 31, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge David E Jones no longer assigned to the case. (amb)
December 31, 2018 Filing 19 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Healthcare Technology Enabled Services LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Noyes, Kelly)
December 31, 2018 Filing 18 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Welcenbach, Robert)
December 28, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by Elizabeth Harwood re 15 Text Only Order - Plaintiff has no objection to the Motion to Intervene (ECF 12) (Borison, Scott)
December 28, 2018 Filing 16 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Healthcare Technology Enabled Services LLC.(Noyes, Kelly)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 12/26/2018. The parties shall advise whether there is any objection to #12 Motion to Intervene by January 11, 2019. (cc: all counsel)(JDG)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 12/26/2018 granting #2 Motion for Leave to File. (cc: all counsel) (JDG)
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Joseph M. Mirabella in Support of Acuity's Motion to Intervene. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Acuity Policy)(Mirabella, Joseph) Modified on 12/20/2018 (amb).
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Intervene by Acuity, a Mutual Insurance Company. (Mirabella, Joseph)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott C Borison on behalf of Elizabeth Harwood. Attorney(s) appearing: Scott C. Borison (Borison, Scott)
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by K Scott Wagner on behalf of Milwaukee Radiologists Ltd SC. Attorney(s) appearing: K. Scott Wagner (Wagner, K)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Milwaukee Radiologists Ltd SC of Robert Welcenbach (Wagner, K)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by Milwaukee Radiologists Ltd SC. (Wagner, K)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 Milwaukee Radiologists, Ltd., S.C.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Milwaukee Radiologists Ltd SC.(Wagner, K)
December 11, 2018 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (kah)
December 10, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly J Noyes on behalf of Healthcare Technology Enabled Services LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Kelly J. Noyes (Noyes, Kelly)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Healthcare Technology Enabled Services LLC.(Lovern, Susan)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Healthcare Technology Enabled Services LLC. (Lovern, Susan)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Tammy Tate . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit A to Affidavit of Tammy Tate, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Affidavit of Tammy Tate)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Lovern, Susan)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File as Restricted to the Parties by Healthcare Technology Enabled Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Baylor v Comprehensive Pain Management Centers Inc, #2 Exhibit Elder Care Providers of Indiana Inc v Home Instead Inc, #3 Exhibit Pinnix v SSC Silver Stream Operating Co LLC)(Lovern, Susan)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Healthcare Technology Enabled Services LLC from Milwaukee County, Case Number: 2018CV009243 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2985420) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lovern, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harwood v. Healthcare Technology Enabled Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Harwood
Represented By: Robert J Welcenbach
Represented By: John Craig Jones
Represented By: Scott C Borison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Radiologists Ltd SC
Represented By: Anne M Plichta
Represented By: K Scott Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Technology Enabled Services LLC
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Acuity, a Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas J Binder
Represented By: Joseph Mario Mirabella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?