Williams et al v. Jess et al
Plaintiff: Stephen K Schwan and Ramon Ashly Williams
Defendant: Cathy Jess, Jim Schwochert, Brad Schimel and John and Jane Does
Case Number: 2:2018cv01953
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 1/8/2019, that on or before 1/30/2019 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 9.76 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, Warden)(mlm)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 PARTIAL Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Stephen K Schwan. (mlm)
January 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Stephen K Schwan. (mlm)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Stephen K Schwan. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mlm)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 DISREGARD ENTRY - RECEIVED DOCUMENTS ON 1/7/2019 SECOND LETTER from the clerk to Stephen K Schwan re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form, Request to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Filing Fee form, and certified copy of six-month trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (mlm) Modified on 1/7/2019 (mlm).
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support of #1 Prisoner Complaint filed by Ramon Ashly Williams. (mlm)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Ramon Ashly Williams. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mlm)
December 26, 2018 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $9.69, receipt number MK4689-075563. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 12/14/2018 that on or before 1/4/2019 plaintiff Ramon Ashly Williams shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 9.69 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, Warden)(mlm)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER from the clerk to Stephen K Schwan re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form, Request to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Filing Fee form, and certified copy of six-month trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (mlm)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Ramon Ashly Williams re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (mlm)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ramon Ashly Williams. (mlm)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Ramon Ashly Williams. (mlm)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against John and Jane Does(Superintendent of the Department of Corrections SORP Sex Offender Registry Program), John and Jane Does(All wardens or superintendents from all minimum institutions/facilities/and centers that have participated in these actions described and named under Cathy A Jess), Cathy Jess, Brad Schimel, Jim Schwochert by Ramon Ashly Williams, Stephen K Schwan. (mlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Jess et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Jess
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Schwochert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Schimel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen K Schwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Ashly Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?