Tax Sandoval v. Nielsen et al
Petitioner: Elias Tax Sandoval
Respondent: Donald Neufeld, Francis Cissna, Department of Homeland Security, Kirstjen Nielsen, Dale Schmidt and US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 2:2018cv01954
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/22/2019. Status Conference continued to 2/21/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. Participants shall call the court's conference line at 888-278-0296 and use access code 8322317# to join the call. (Tape #2:59:37 - 3:10:45 pm) (lz)
January 22, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/22/2019 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. Participants shall call the court's conference line at 888-278-0296 and use access code 8322317# to join the call. (cc: all counsel)(lz)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 1/7/2019 DENYING #7 Defendants' Motion to Stay all briefing. The respondents shall answer the petition no later than January 29, 2019. The petitioner's Motion for a Temporary Stay of his removal #8 is GRANTED. The Department of Homeland Security (DHS) and Immigration and Customs Enforcement - Enforcement and Removal Operations (ICE ERO) shall not remove Elias Tax Sandoval from the United States, and the stay shall remain in effect pending further order by the court. (cc: all counsel) (lz)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 EMERGENCY REQUEST FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (First MOTION to Stay Removal) by Elias Tax Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ICE Decision Denying Motion to Stay)(Fagundes, Luca) Modified on 1/7/2019 (lz).
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay of Briefing by All Defendants. (Warwick, Lisa)
December 20, 2018 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (lz)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Warwick, Lisa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa T Warwick on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: AUSA Lisa T. Warwick (Warwick, Lisa)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Elias Tax Sandoval signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 12/18/2018. Tax asks this court to stay his removal pending the resolution of his U-visa application and "to order USCIS to either (a) make a prima facie determination that he is eligible for a U-visa such that he can get a stay of removal from ICE; or (b) adjudicate his U-visa application so that he can stay in the United States." At this preliminary stage the court is concerned only with Tax's petition for habeas relief. The Clerk shall promptly serve the respondents. The respondents shall answer or otherwise respond to this action within 21 days of the date of this order. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to US Attorney, Sheriff-Dodge County Jail, US Dept of Homeland Security; US Dept of Justice; ICE with copy of Petition)(lz)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Elias Tax Sandoval. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Fagundes, Luca)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elias Tax Sandoval (Fagundes, Luca)
December 11, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Elias Tax Sandoval. ( Filing Fee PAID $5 receipt number 0757-2986608) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fagundes, Luca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2018: #2 CORRECTED Civil Cover Sheet - Milw case) (lz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tax Sandoval v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donald Neufeld
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Francis Cissna
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dale Schmidt
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elias Tax Sandoval
Represented By: Luca L Fagundes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?