Chen v. Nielsen et al

Plaintiff: Qiong Chen
Defendant: Kristine Crandall, Kirstjen Nielsen and Matthew Whitaker
Case Number: 2:2018cv01962
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Warwick, Lisa)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa T Warwick on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: AUSA Lisa T. Warwick (Warwick, Lisa)
December 14, 2018 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Qiong Chen This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Chien, David)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Qiong Chen This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Chien, David)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Qiong Chen This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Chien, David)
December 13, 2018 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The attached summons was not prepared using the version found on our website - please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (asc)
December 12, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kristine Crandall, Kirstjen Nielsen, Matthew Whitaker by Qiong Chen. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2987985) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Chien, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristine Crandall
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Whitaker
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qiong Chen
Represented By: David Chien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?