Mapes v Washington County et al
Plaintiff: Jamie R. Mapes
Defendant: Washington County, John Doe #1-10, Dale Schmidt, Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc, Nurses 1-10, Wisconsin County Mutual Insurance Company, Doctors 1-10, ABC Insurance Company, GHI Insurance Company and DEF Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv01977
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R Starnes on behalf of Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Charles R. Starnes (Starnes, Charles)
February 11, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas S Knott on behalf of Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Douglas S. Knott (Knott, Douglas)
February 9, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc served on 1/25/2019. (Cade, Nathaniel)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 2/6/2019: Interim Settlement Report due by 7/22/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 7/25/2019; Final Settlement Report due by 11/18/2019; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 11/22/2019; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 11/27/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2019 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 12/9/2019 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
January 30, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by Dale Schmidt, Washington County, Wisconsin County Mutual Insurance Company.(Lubinsky, Lori)
January 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori M Lubinsky on behalf of Wisconsin County Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Atty. Lori M. Lubinsky (Lubinsky, Lori)
January 25, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 1/25/2019. (Court Reporter Rich Ehrlich) (nb)
January 18, 2019 Summons Issued as to Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc, Wisconsin County Mutual Insurance Company. (asc)
January 17, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Dale Schmidt, Washington County. (Lubinsky, Lori)
January 17, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs fo Advanced Correctional Healthcare (Cade, Nathaniel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Jamie R. Mapes (Cade, Nathaniel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Jamie R. Mapes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cade, Nathaniel)
January 10, 2019 Filing 12 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dale Schmidt, Washington County.(Lubinsky, Lori)
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Renee Pierre on behalf of Dale Schmidt, Washington County. Attorney(s) appearing: Kristin Renee Pierre (Pierre, Kristin)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Dale Schmidt, Washington County. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Lubinsky, Lori)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 1/25/2019 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 1/22/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
January 4, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dale Schmidt, Washington County.(Lubinsky, Lori)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori M Lubinsky on behalf of Dale Schmidt, Washington County. Attorney(s) appearing: Lori M. Lubinsky (Lubinsky, Lori)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Dale Schmidt served on 12/18/2018. (Cade, Nathaniel)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Washington County served on 12/18/2018. (Cade, Nathaniel)
December 17, 2018 Summons Issued as to Dale Schmidt, Washington County. (asc)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Cade, Nathaniel)
December 14, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Jamie R. Mapes (Cade, Nathaniel)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Jamie R. Mapes (Cade, Nathaniel)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Jamie R. Mapes. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2990290) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet)(Cade, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mapes v Washington County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County
Represented By: Lori M Lubinsky
Represented By: Kristin Renee Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Schmidt
Represented By: Lori M Lubinsky
Represented By: Kristin Renee Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc
Represented By: Charles R Starnes
Represented By: Douglas S Knott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurses 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Lori M Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctors 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHI Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie R. Mapes
Represented By: Nathaniel Cade, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?