Gauthier Biomedical Inc v. Bradshaw Medical Inc
Plaintiff: Gauthier Biomedical Inc
Defendant: Bradshaw Medical Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv02007
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Due to non-consent, case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (mlm)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Gauthier Biomedical Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Fredrickson, John)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Gauthier Biomedical Inc. (Fredrickson, John)
January 22, 2019 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to Plaintiff requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed by January 30, 2019; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (mlm)
January 22, 2019 SECOND NOTICE - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days (mlm)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (mlm)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 ATTACHMENTS Exhibit A US TM Reg No 5,478,595 by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint. (Fredrickson, John)
December 21, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Bradshaw Medical Inc by Gauthier Biomedical Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2995490) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fredrickson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gauthier Biomedical Inc v. Bradshaw Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gauthier Biomedical Inc
Represented By: John P Fredrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradshaw Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?