McFarland v. Racine Unified School District
Plaintiff: Nakreisha McFarland
Defendant: Racine Unified School District
Case Number: 2:2019cv00028
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference re ECF No. 44 (Case No. 18-cv-4) and #9 February 28 Scheduling Conference set for 3/6/2019 02:00 PM By Telephone before Magistrate Judge David E Jones. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at 877-848-7030 and use access code 3866147# to join the call. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail and Telephone to Plaintiff)(kah) Modified on 3/1/2019 (kah).
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David E Jones: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 2/28/2019. Defendant agrees cases could be placed on a parallel schedule but suggests dismissing 18-cv-4. Court directs Ms. Erickson to provide discovery and dispositive motions dates to Katina_Hubacz@wied.uscourts.gov. Court will enter a Show Cause Order with an objections date. If objections are filed, a hearing will be set. (Copy mailed to Ms. McFarland) (Tape #10:06:15-10:12:14) (kah)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David E Jones: Motion Hearing held on 2/12/2019. Court GRANTS #2 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Nakreisha McFarland. Court directs Mr. Kinne is terminated from case. Court Directs Mr. Kinne to send by certified mail all documents associated with case to Ms. McFarland. Court directs Mr. Kinne to send discovery requests to the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in By Telephone before Magistrate Judge David E Jones. Minutes and call-in information sent to Ms. McFarland via US Mail. (Tape #1:37:06 - 2:11:38.) (amb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2019: #1 Sealed Minutes) (amb).
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Racine Unified School District. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Erickson, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Racine Unified School District.(Erickson, Elizabeth)
February 6, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on #2 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney : Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2019 01:30 PM By Telephone before Magistrate Judge David E Jones. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at 877-848-7030 and use access code 3866147# to join the call.(cc: all counsel - via telephone call and US Mail to Ms. McFarland) (kah)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST for Hearing by Nakreisha McFarland. (amb)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Racine Unified School District served on 1/22/2019. (Kinne, Paul)
January 18, 2019 Summons Issued as to Racine Unified School District. (bx)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Paul A. Kinne (Kinne, Paul)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Nakreisha McFarland. (Kinne, Paul)
January 4, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (bx)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Racine Unified School District by Nakreisha McFarland. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-3003078) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Kinne, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFarland v. Racine Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nakreisha McFarland
Represented By: Paul A Kinne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Racine Unified School District
Represented By: Elizabeth A Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?