Jones v. Iron Workers Local 8
Plaintiff: Ricky Jones
Defendant: Iron Workers Local 8
Case Number: 2:2019cv00041
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #4 Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff)(asc)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Iron Workers Local 8 filed by Ricky Jones.(asc)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff's #2 motion for leave to proceed without prepaying the filing fee is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff file an amended complaint consistent with this order within 30 days. Should Jones fail to file an amended complaint within 30 days consistent with this order, I will recommend that this action be dismissed. (Attachments: #1 Legal Assistance Program Guide) (cc: all counsel, plaintiff w/ new complaint form) (asc)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Ricky Jones. (amb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Iron Workers Local 8 filed by Ricky Jones. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Iron Workers Local 8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iron Workers Local 8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?