Alberth v. Southern Lakes Plumbing & Heating Inc et al

Plaintiff: Raymond Alberth
Defendant: Southern Lakes Plumbing & Heating Inc and Scott R Plucinski
Case Number: 2:2019cv00062
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Raymond Alberth. (Olson, Alan)
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond Alberth. Scott Plucinksi served 2/4/19. (Olson, Alan) Modified text on 2/27/2019 (blr).
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond Alberth. Southern Lakes Plumbing & Heating Inc served on 1/24/2019. (Olson, Alan)
February 25, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at 877- 336-1839 and use access code 5188910# to join the call. The parties' Rule 26(f) Report is due no later than 3/15/2019. (cc: all counsel) (blr)
February 22, 2019 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (blr)
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Johnson, Theodore)
February 14, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANTS requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (blr)
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Johnson, Theodore)
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants.(Johnson, Theodore)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond Alberth. Scott R Plucinski served on 2/4/2019. (Olson, Alan)
January 14, 2019 Summons Reissued as to Scott R Plucinski (corrected spelling). (blr)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Raymond Alberth (Olson, Alan)
January 11, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The attached summons was not saved properly and cannot be issued electronically at this time. Please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. Please refer to the # summons instructions for further guidance. (blr)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Raymond Alberth (Olson, Alan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Raymond Alberth (Olson, Alan)
January 11, 2019 Summons Issued as to Scott R Plucinski, Southern Lakes Plumbing & Heating Inc. (blr)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Raymond Alberth. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Olson, Alan)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Raymond Alberth (Olson, Alan)
January 10, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Raymond Alberth (Olson, Alan)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Raymond Alberth. (Olson, Alan)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Raymond Alberth. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-3007753) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olson, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alberth v. Southern Lakes Plumbing & Heating Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Lakes Plumbing & Heating Inc
Represented By: Theodore N Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott R Plucinski
Represented By: Theodore N Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Alberth
Represented By: Alan C Olson
Represented By: Nicholas M McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?