Wustrack v. Aetna Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Yvonne Wustrack
Defendant: Envison Healthcare Facilities Development Group LLC and Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00063
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
0 Judge: Nancy Joseph
1 Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tina M Bengs on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Tina M. Bengs (Bengs, Tina)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) as to Envision Healthcare Facilities Development Group, LLC Only by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Mathisen, Eric)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company.(Mathisen, Eric)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric P Mathisen on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Eric P. Mathisen (Mathisen, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (asc)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Johnson, Mark)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Yvonne Wustrack. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Doherty, Ryan)
January 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants. Answer due 2/14/2019. (llc)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 1/16/2019 granting #4 Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The defendants are granted an extension of time to and including February 14, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (cc: all counsel) (llc)
January 16, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT; Aetna Life Insurance Company requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Enlarge Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Johnson, Mark)
January 10, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Johnson, Mark)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A Johnson on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Mark A. Johnson (Johnson, Mark)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aetna Life Insurance Company from Green Lake Circuit Court, Case Number: 2018CV000124 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-3007806) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, state court record, #2 Exhibit B, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to be filed in the state court action, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Mark) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/10/2019) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wustrack v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envison Healthcare Facilities Development Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark A Johnson
Represented By: Eric P Mathisen
Represented By: Tina M Bengs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Wustrack
Represented By: Ryan Vieth Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?