Rice v. Kickstarter PBC

Plaintiff: Mark Rice
Defendant: Kickstarter PBC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00069
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Mark Rice in Support of #14 Response to #7 Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(jcl)
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Mark Rice re #7 MOTION for Leave to File to File its Answer to the Complaint and to Set Aside the Entry of Default if Granted. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(jcl)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE Statement by Mark Rice. (jcl)
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Rice (jcl)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kickstarter PBC (Friedman, James)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by Kickstarter PBC. (Friedman, James)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of James Rosenfeld in Support of Kickstarter's Motion for Leave to File its Answer to the Complaint and to Set Aside the Entry of Default, If Granted (Friedman, James)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support filed by Kickstarter PBC re #7 MOTION for Leave to File to File its Answer to the Complaint and to Set Aside the Entry of Default if Granted . (Friedman, James)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File to File its Answer to the Complaint and to Set Aside the Entry of Default if Granted by Kickstarter PBC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Answer)(Friedman, James)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Mark Rice In Support of Request for Entry of Default (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(jcl)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST for Entry of Default by Mark Rice (jcl)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Rice. Kickstarter PBC served on 1/23/2019. (jcl)
January 11, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (via US mail to Plaintiff) (asc)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Mark Rice. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (asc)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kickstarter PBC filed by Mark Rice. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (Filing Fee PAID ; MK4689075804) (Service Packet/Summons Issued ) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits w/ Bookmarks)(asc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Kickstarter PBC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kickstarter PBC
Represented By: James A Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?