Dronco GmbH v. Qingdao Bronco Rubber Co Ltd

Plaintiff: Dronco, GmbH and Dronco GmbH
Defendant: Qingdao Bronco Rubber Co., Ltd. and Qingdao Bronco Rubber Co Ltd
Case Number: 2:2019cv00077
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from Attorney Kyle M. Costello . (Costello, Kyle)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Costello, Kyle)
February 4, 2019 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed no later than February 18, 2019; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (asc)
January 14, 2019 Summons Issued as to Qingdao Bronco Rubber Co Ltd. (asc)
January 11, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Dronco, GmbH. (Brookman, Adam)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Dronco, GmbH (Brookman, Adam)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Qingdao Bronco Rubber Co., Ltd. by Dronco, GmbH. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-3009114) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brookman, Adam) Modified on 1/14/2019 (asc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dronco GmbH v. Qingdao Bronco Rubber Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dronco, GmbH
Represented By: Adam L Brookman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dronco GmbH
Represented By: Adam L Brookman
Represented By: Kyle M Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qingdao Bronco Rubber Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qingdao Bronco Rubber Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?