Vargas v. Miller et al

Defendant: Kirstjen M Nielsen, Matthew Whitaker, Ricardo Wong and Justin Miller
Petitioner: Fernando Vargas
Case Number: 2:2019cv00092
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 2/26/2019 denying #8 Motion for Hearing. (cc: all counsel) (aeiw)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY filed by Fernando Vargas re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Response to Respondents Return to Habeas Petition. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elmore, Christopher)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Fernando Vargas re #7 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Withdraw Naturalization Claim. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elmore, Christopher) Modified event on 2/26/2019 (blr). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2019: #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3) (asc).
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Fernando Vargas re #8 First MOTION for Hearing Date. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(Elmore, Christopher)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Defendants re #8 First MOTION for Hearing . (Warwick, Lisa)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Hearing by Fernando Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(Elmore, Christopher)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Defendants re #1 MOTION for Order Return to Habeas Petition and MOTION TO DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to Appear, #2 Exhibit B - IJ Order and Decision, #3 Exhibit C - DHS Brief)(Warwick, Lisa) Modified event on 2/15/2019 (blr).
February 8, 2019 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (blr)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Warwick, Lisa)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa T Warwick on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: AUSA Lisa T. Warwick (Warwick, Lisa)
January 27, 2019 TRANSMIT #1 Petition and #4 Rule 4 Order via US mail to Justin Miller, US Attorney-Eastern District of Wisconsin, US Attorney General, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, and Department of Homeland Security. (blr)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 4 ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall effect service of the petition and this Order upon respondents pursuant to Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT that respondents shall have twenty days, until February 14, 2019, to show cause why the writ should not be granted. If respondents fail to show good cause in accordance with this order, I will recommend that Vargass petition be granted. (cc: all counsel)(blr)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION for Order to Show Cause and Incorporated Memorandum in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Fernando Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elmore, Christopher) Modified on 1/23/2019 (blr).
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Fernando Vargas. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elmore, Christopher)
January 16, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Request MOTION for Release from Detention filed by Fernando Vargas. ( Filing Fee PAID $5 receipt number 0757-3012029) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elmore, Christopher) Modified on 1/17/2019 (asc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vargas v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M Nielsen
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Whitaker
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Wong
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Miller
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fernando Vargas
Represented By: Christopher P Elmore
Represented By: Jacob S Briskman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?